Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2020 at 02:09:08 (UTC).

TERRY J LARUE VS HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/09/2014 TERRY J LARUE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA M. SCHEPER, KEVIN C. BRAZILE, JOHN P. FARRELL, MALCOLM MACKEY and JOHN L. SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6095

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

JOHN P. FARRELL

MALCOLM MACKEY

JOHN L. SEGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARUE TERRY J.

Defendants

ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA A

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC.

BIRINDER S. BRARA M.D.

ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA APMC

BIRINDER S. BRARA M.D

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIANELLI & MORRIS A LAW CORPORATION

GIANELLI & MORRIS ALC

GLOVSHY SCOTT C. ESQ.

THE KERN LAW GROUP PC

Defendant Attorneys

MCCLELLAND ADVOCACY

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN ET AL.

MANATT PHELPS & PHILLIPS LLP

GRIGNON MARGARET ESQ

AL. CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN ET

ADVOCACY MCCLELLAND

ROSENTHAL KARA JEAN

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) RE MALCOLM H. MACKEY

11/8/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) RE MALCOLM H. MACKEY

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE MALCOLM MACKEY CCP 170.6

11/13/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE MALCOLM MACKEY CCP 170.6

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/16/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

STIPULATION RE CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

3/19/2015: STIPULATION RE CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/24/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

6/24/2015: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

DECLARATION OF ADRIAN J. BARRIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PRODUCE ITS PMK FOR DEPOSITION

9/29/2015: DECLARATION OF ADRIAN J. BARRIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PRODUCE ITS PMK FOR DEPOSITION

Minute Order -

8/24/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PRODUCE GARY NIEMAN, PAMELA ALEXANDER AND CHRISTOPHER HILL FOR DEPOSITION

9/30/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PRODUCE GARY NIEMAN, PAMELA ALEXANDER AND CHRISTOPHER HILL FOR DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER QUASHING HEALTH NET'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO AT&T WIRELESS SERVICES; ETC.

1/4/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER QUASHING HEALTH NET'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO AT&T WIRELESS SERVICES; ETC.

MOTION IN LIMINE #B OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO DEPOSITION EXHIBIT 582, THE DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE FINAL REPORT, DATED FEBRUARY 13, 2014

3/30/2017: MOTION IN LIMINE #B OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO DEPOSITION EXHIBIT 582, THE DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE FINAL REPORT, DATED FEBRUARY 13, 2014

DECLARATION OF BRAD SEILING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'S MOTIONS IN L1MINE #A-D

3/30/2017: DECLARATION OF BRAD SEILING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.'S MOTIONS IN L1MINE #A-D

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE LAURA DOLAN'S TRIAL TESTIMONY

4/5/2017: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE LAURA DOLAN'S TRIAL TESTIMONY

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND REFERENCE TO RECREATIONAL MARIJUANA USE BY PLAINTIFF

4/5/2017: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND REFERENCE TO RECREATIONAL MARIJUANA USE BY PLAINTIFF

JOINDER OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. "A" FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING THE "2012 DMHC CEASE AND DESIST CONSENT ORDERS" FROM THIS

4/5/2017: JOINDER OF DEFENDANT HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. TO DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. "A" FOR AN ORDER EXCLUDING THE "2012 DMHC CEASE AND DESIST CONSENT ORDERS" FROM THIS

DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA INC'S OBJECTIONS AND OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S "PROPOSED JUDGEMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT" AS CONTRARY TO LAW AND FACTS OF THIS CASE; ETC

5/9/2017: DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA INC'S OBJECTIONS AND OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S "PROPOSED JUDGEMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT" AS CONTRARY TO LAW AND FACTS OF THIS CASE; ETC

DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE WA, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT [C.C.P. 629]

7/27/2017: DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE WA, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT [C.C.P. 629]

DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGME NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

7/27/2017: DEFENDANT ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGME NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

389 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • Hearing01/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Hearing01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Hearing01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Hearing02/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Kevin J. Kuhn); Filed by Accountable Health Care IPA, APMC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Accountable Health Care IPA, APMC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 11:12 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
819 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-12-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Terry J. Larue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC566095    Hearing Date: August 10, 2020    Dept: 55

The application is granted.

The Court finds that it sufficiently complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40, including the applicant’s declaration addressing the rule elements.

Additionally, no reason appears to deny the application, including because of the absence of any opposition.

A judge’s determination of whether to grant an application to appear pro hac vice is evaluated under the abuse-of-discretion standardWalter E. Heller Western, Inc. v. Sup. Ct. (1980) 111 Cal.App.3d 706, 711; United States Golf Ass'n v. Arroyo Software Corp. (1999) 69 Cal. App. 4th 607, 624; Magee v. Sup. Ct. (1973) 8 Cal.3d 949, 953-54 (criminal action). There is no statement of the limit of court discretion in ruling on applications to appear pro hac vice in civil cases. Sheller v. Sup. Ct. (2008) 158 Cal.App.4th 1697, 1713If

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH CARE IPA DBA ACCOUNTABLE HEALTH PLAN MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margaret M. Grignon