This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 12:51:11 (UTC).

TERRY ISON VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 TERRY ISON filed an Other lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6937

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ISON TERRY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-50

LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNIVERSITY OF

Other

GIBSON ROBERT B. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES FO GERALDINE LY

GIBSON ROBERT B. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MALLORY GEORGE L. JR. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

1/13/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

SUMMONS

1/13/2016: SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/1/2016: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF TERRY ISON

7/1/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF TERRY ISON

ORDER STRIKING PRAYER FOR PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST FROM COMPLAINT

8/25/2016: ORDER STRIKING PRAYER FOR PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST FROM COMPLAINT

JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER STRIKING PRAYER FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST FROM COMPLAINT

8/25/2016: JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER STRIKING PRAYER FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST FROM COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

10/18/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2/8/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

3/27/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. SOLBERG, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

3/27/2017: DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. SOLBERG, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM PANNELL, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

3/27/2017: DECLARATION OF WILLIAM PANNELL, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATIONS OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR. AND JEWELENE WALLER

3/27/2017: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATIONS OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR. AND JEWELENE WALLER

DEFENDANT'S MOTION LIMINE NO. FOR ORDER PRECLUDING EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS AND COSTS OF FUTURE MEDICAL TREATMENT WITHOUT PROPER FOUNDATION FROM A QUALIFIED EXPERT REGARDING THEIR

6/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION LIMINE NO. FOR ORDER PRECLUDING EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS AND COSTS OF FUTURE MEDICAL TREATMENT WITHOUT PROPER FOUNDATION FROM A QUALIFIED EXPERT REGARDING THEIR

DEFENDANT'S MOTION LIMINE NO. FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY BY PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR.; EXHIBITS

6/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION LIMINE NO. FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY BY PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR.; EXHIBITS

DEFENDANT'S MOTION LIMINE NO. FOR ORDER LIMITING PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY OF MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNT PAID BY OR ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, NOT AMOUNT BILLED, AND FOR ORDER LIMITING EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S

6/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION LIMINE NO. FOR ORDER LIMITING PLAINTIFF'S RECOVERY OF MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNT PAID BY OR ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, NOT AMOUNT BILLED, AND FOR ORDER LIMITING EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFF'S

Minute Order

6/13/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/14/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/23/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 97; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • at 01:30 pm in Department 97, Benny C. Osorio, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment (CONT FROM 06/13/17160710142028) - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Terry Ison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Los Angeles County University of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Notice of Continuance (NTC OF CONT OF MSJ ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Notice, Association of Counsel; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Terry Ison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Terry Ison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR., ESQ. (SBN 86311) GEORGE L. MALLORY, JR. & ASSOCIATES

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2000 Los Angeles, California 90067-2701 Telephone: (310) 788-5555 Facsimile: (310) 788-5570

Attorneys for Defendant

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (erroneously sued as

“LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA MEDICAL CENTER”)

[Exempt from Filing Fee (Gov. Code § 6103)]

FILE

. S ‘ Recejye 8eror Cour o o

N 172016 AUG o

Fijj . Sherri R. Cane ng Wm%;w - r

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT -STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

TERRY ISON, Plaintiff, Vs.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA MEDICAL

CENTER; DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE;

Defendants.

s’ e’ et e’ e’ “migr”

CASE NO. BC606937

JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER STRIKING PRAYER FOR PRE- JUDGMENT INTEREST FROM COMPLAINT

[Filed and served concurrently with Proposed Order]

Assigned to: Honorable Benny Osorio

Department 97 Complaint Filed: January 13, 2016 Trial: July 13, 2017

JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER FOR ORDER STRIKING PRAYER FOR PRE- JUDGMENT INTEREST

Plaintiff Terry Ison and Defendant County of Los Angeles (errofieously sued herein as “LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA MEDICAL CENTER?”), by

and through their respective counsel of record, hereby stipulate to the entry of an Order Striking the

request for pre-judgment interest from the Prayer of Plaintiff’s Complaint this action, without leave to

amend, as set forth below.

1. Counsel for Plaintiff has granted a fifteen day extension pursuant to LASC Local Rule

3.110(d) to July 5, 2016 for Defendant to file a responsive pleading in the above-entitled action.

WWIN-CK3T7VP6HFO\Atty\GLM\8850\Pleadings\Joint Stipulation re Prejudgment Interest.wpd