This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 14:55:31 (UTC).

TERRY HOLLABAUGH, ET-AL VS. MCKESSON CORPORATION, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2012 TERRY HOLLABAUGH, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MCKESSON CORPORATION, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7016

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOLLABAUGH TERRY

REYNOLDS DANNY

RHODES DOROTHEA

RICHARD JUDY

RICHARDSON JIMMY

RIGGINS CARL SR.

RIGGS VICTORIA

RISSEL TIMOTHY

ROBERTS ANGELA

ROBERTS DIANE

ROBINSON DENNIS

ROSE CHARLOTTE

ROSE ROBERT

ROTH JEAN

RUNYON BARBARA

SAMUEL MARY

SANFORD CHRIS

SAUSEDA MARICELA

SCHLOTMAN LINDA

SCHUESSLER KENNETH

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIZEMORE LAW FIRM THE

Other Attorneys

GOODMAN NEUMAN HAMILTON LLP

SEDGWICK LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: 1) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/12/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: 1) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Unknown

4/12/2013: Unknown

Minute Order

4/19/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/10/2014: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REMAND ORDER FILED FROM U.S. DISTRICT COURT CENTRAL DISTRICT ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less