This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 00:20:23 (UTC).

TERRY CURTIS BUCKMAN VS MAGELLAN GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 TERRY CURTIS BUCKMAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MAGELLAN GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0811

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCKMAN TERRY CURTIS

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DOES 1 TO 25

FERGUSON CATLIN

KALTENBORN KARI

LEVINE ROBERT

MAGELLAN GROUP INC.

MUKHERJEE SOMY

SLUSSER MARTIN

STALEY KEVIN

YARBER KEYANA

YEUNG BILLY

MAGELLAN STORAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ALLEN MATKINS LECK AND GAMBLE

NATSIS ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by MAGELLAN GROUP, INC. (Defendant); MAGELLAN STORAGE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Notice; Filed by MAGELLAN GROUP, INC. (Defendant); MAGELLAN STORAGE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department B; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion For Attorney Fees; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • at 08:29 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion For Attorney Fees; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by MAGELLAN GROUP, INC. (Defendant); MAGELLAN STORAGE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by MAGELLAN GROUP, INC. (Defendant); MAGELLAN STORAGE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by MAGELLAN GROUP, INC. (Defendant); MAGELLAN STORAGE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice; Filed by MAGELLAN GROUP, INC. (Defendant); MAGELLAN STORAGE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Summons; Filed by TERRY CURTIS BUCKMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Motion; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by TERRY CURTIS BUCKMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by TERRY CURTIS BUCKMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.