This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:59:07 (UTC).

TERRELL CRYER VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2015 TERRELL CRYER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8240

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

CRYER HELEN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

RILEY WILLIAM

Minor

CRYER TERRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REYNOLDS JAMES LEE

GREENLY MARLENE DIANE

Defendant Attorney

HUNT JAMES ALBERT

Minor Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARLENE D. GREENLY

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

3/9/2017: Legacy Document

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES FOR 60 DAYS; ETC.

1/18/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES FOR 60 DAYS; ETC.

Notice

1/29/2018: Notice

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET 3, TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM RILEY

3/19/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET 3, TO DEFENDANT WILLIAM RILEY

SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 3.1345

3/19/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 3.1345

NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL NO. 1 OFF CALFNDAR

4/2/2018: NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL NO. 1 OFF CALFNDAR

Minute Order

7/3/2018: Minute Order

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc

11/30/2018: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc

Notice

1/28/2019: Notice

Minute Order

5/31/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF MANDATORY DUTY; ETC

10/19/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF MANDATORY DUTY; ETC

Minute Order

5/12/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF LEGAL COUNSEL

5/12/2017: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF LEGAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/24/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/24/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/25/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

11/7/2017: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of P...) of 05/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Notice (Resetting OSC Re: Dismissal); Filed by Helen Cryer (Plaintiff); Terrell Cryer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice (Resetting OSC Re: Dismissal); Filed by Helen Cryer (Plaintiff); Terrell Cryer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-03-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF MANDATORY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC598240    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 4A

Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise

Having considered the petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows.  No opposing papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

On October 19, 2015, Plaintiff Terrell Cryer, by and through his guardian ad litem Helen Cryer, filed a complaint against Defendants Los Angeles Unified School District and William Riley alleging a breach of a mandatory duty and general negligence for Defendant Riley’s pushing of Plaintiff’s head into a pole on June 2, 2014.

On August 28, 2019, Petitioner Helen Cryer filed a petition to approve a compromise of pending action for Plaintiff.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is set for November 12, 2019.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Petitioner Helen Cryer (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to grant a petition to approve a compromise of pending action for Plaintiff Terrell Cryer (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952(a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Claimant’s attendance is not required due to his age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petition is properly approved.

All of the required attachments are included with the petition. Los Angeles Unified School District and William Riley are to pay jointly and severally.  $1,668.47 of the gross settlement is to cover medical expenses, including a $1,250.07 payment to Department of Health Care Services and a $418.40 payment to the Rawlings Company LLC.  $8,750 or 25% of the gross settlement is to be paid for attorney’s fees, which is reasonable considering the preliminary discovery and motion practice that was conducted in this case as outlined in James L. Reynolds’ declaration.  $2,817.02 of the gross settlement is to be paid for costs.  The net settlement of $21,764.51 is to be deposited in a blocked account at Wells Fargo bank, 36495 Stocker Street, Los Angeles, California 90008 subject to withdrawal only upon the authorization of the Court.

The Court notes that item 19.b.(2) is not selected in the petition.  But this failure to select this option is not fatal to the petition because it is clear Petitioner mistakenly failed to select this option.  This is because the net settlement is still included in this section and there is an Attachment 19b(3), both of which would only be present if it were Petitioner’s intention to have the net settlement deposited into a blocked account subject to withdrawal upon Court approval.

The petition for minor’s compromise filed on August 28, 2019 for Claimant is APPROVED.

The Court shall sign the proposed order concurrently filed with the August 28, 2019 petition for minor’s compromise.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.