This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 04:59:22 (UTC).

TELMA YOMARI FLORES GONZALEZ VS CM LAUNDRY LLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2014 TELMA YOMARI FLORES GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CM LAUNDRY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, ELIZABETH R. FEFFER, KEVIN C. BRAZILE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5854

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GONZALEZ TELMA YOMARI FLORES

GUZMAN JOSE ROLANDO LOPEZ

MUNOZ ERNESTO

PALACIOS LUIS ANTONIO LARA

HERNANDEZ LISSETH

RODRIGUEZ LEONEL

RODRIGUEZ LUIS

RODRIGUEZ JONES

SAQUIC DANNY- ROE 1

RODRIGUEZ LUIS-NOTICE OF STAY

HEREDIA WILLY

GONZALEZ JOSE

ARIAS HERBERTH

CLASSIC LAUNDRY AND FINISHING INC.

HEREDIA LESTER

NOLAXCO JAIME

SANDOVAL DANY

RIVERA MARCOS

SEQUIC DANNY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CM LAUNDRY LLC

RODRIGUEZ LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TREDWAY LUMSDAINE & DOYLE LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSS PETER W. ESQ

SUSSMAN SHANK LLP

LAW OFFICES OF GARY FREEDMAN

ROSS PETER W.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

SPLINTER & THAI LLP

BAZAN HUERTA & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ((19GDCP00341) - GLENDALE COURTHOUSE - HIGHER CASE)

9/21/2020: Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ((19GDCP00341) - GLENDALE COURTHOUSE - HIGHER CASE)

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT LUIS ANTONIO LARA PALACIOS

5/15/2014: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT LUIS ANTONIO LARA PALACIOS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/15/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

5/15/2014: SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/17/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/17/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/17/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

NOTICE OF HEARING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/3/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

9/9/2014: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY CM LAUNDRY, LLC

10/17/2014: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY CM LAUNDRY, LLC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

10/22/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

10/31/2014: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF RULING RE: AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

11/19/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE: AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE [C.C.P. ?170.6]

1/7/2015: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE [C.C.P. ?170.6]

Minute Order -

1/20/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE RE PREVIOUS POSTING OF JURY FEES

3/25/2015: NOTICE RE PREVIOUS POSTING OF JURY FEES

Minute Order -

5/5/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/21/2016: Minute Order -

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Firm Name); Filed by CM Laundry, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to File Notice of Related Case) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to File Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (David A. Salyer, CSR#4410)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (((19GDCP00341) - Glendale Courthouse - Higher Case)); Filed by CM Laundry, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to File Notice of Related Case); Filed by CM Laundry, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Tyler J. King In Support of Judgment Creditor CM Laundry, LLC's Ex Parte Application to File Notice of Related Case); Filed by CM Laundry, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Docketat 00:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT JOSE ROLANDO LOPEZ GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • DocketANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT JOSE GONZALEZ TO XC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT LEONEL RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC545854    Hearing Date: September 21, 2020    Dept: 73

9/21/20

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

FLORES GONZALEZ vs. CM LAUNDRY, LLC and related cross-action (BC545854)

Counsel for Cross-complainant/moving party CM Laundry, LLC: Browne George Ross LLP (Peter Ross; Tyler King)

Counsel for interested non-parties: Law Offices of Henry Jannol, APC (Rebecca Wester)

Matter:

Cross-complainant CM Laundry, LLC’s Ex Parte Application to File Notice of Related Case (filed 9/18/20)

Tentative ruling

The court has read and considered CM Laundry, LLC’s ex parte application.

Plaintiff’s Ex Parte Application to File Notice of Related Case is granted. The court finds that CM Laundry was adjudged a judgment creditor in this matter and remains a party for electronic filing purposes. Its earlier attempted filing of the Notice of Related Case, as described in counsel’s declaration, should have been accepted for this court’s consideration.

Although the usual ex parte grounds under CRC 3.1202(c) do not exist (no immediate harm, etc.), the court accepts the filing at this time to avoid any further delays. The court GRANTS CM Laundry’s ex parte application and will accept the filing of the Notice of Related Case in BC545854 and deem it filed as of this date. It has not been served on other named parties in BC545854. However, all other parties were either dismissed or defaulted. The court also finds that service of the Notice has been previously made in the pending Glendale case (19GDCP00341) and those parties do not oppose this application. There is no other party requiring service of the Notice under CRC 3.300(d).

Turning to the merits of the Notice of Related Case, after applying the factors enumerated in CRC 3.300 and Local Rule 3.3(f), the court finds that the cases are not related.

This case started as a wage and hour case against CM Laundry, LLC that was eventually dismissed when the named plaintiff failed to prosecute her complaint. This action proceeded under CM Laundry, LLC’s cross-complaint against several parties alleging various business tort claims. More than 4 years ago, on 6/24/16 CM Laundry, LLC obtained a default judgment against only one cross-defendant, Classic Laundry and Finishing, Inc. All other cross-defendants were dismissed.

On 8/15/19 CM Laundry, LLC filed a separate action in the Glendale case (19GDCP00341) and now seeks to relate that case with BC545854. Antonio Valadez and Hermelinda Rendon are named as the individual defendants in the Glendale case. Neither was a party in this action nor does the record reflect that either voluntarily appeared for any purpose. CM Laundry, LLC’s Glendale action asserts Valadez and Rendon should be liable for the Classic Laundry judgment it obtained in this case pursuant to alter ego theories.

While CM Laundry is the plaintiff in each case, the defendants are not the same. Further, the court finds CM Laundry’s claims in each case are neither the same nor are they similar. While certain underlying facts overlap, alter ego issues were not part of BC545854 and neither Valadez nor Rendon was named in this case. This case went to judgment based on Classic Laundry’s default. No significant efficiencies would be achieved by relating the actions. Thus, the court finds the issues in the Glendale case are unlikely to require substantial duplication of judicial resources or a danger of inconsistent rulings if heard in different courts.

No party will be prejudiced as a result of this ruling. There is nothing automatic about relating different cases for post-judgment alter ego determinations. Until just recently it was the court’s practice to assign post-judgment matters in unlimited civil cases for hearing in different courts (at Mosk, Dept. 44 handled such matters until its recent closure during the pandemic). The court exercises its discretion in not relating the cases.

Unless waived, notice of ruling by moving party.