This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 00:02:58 (UTC).

TANYA HIJAZI VS FOOD FORWARD INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2016 TANYA HIJAZI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD FORWARD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROY L. PAUL, PETER J. MIRICH and GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2373

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROY L. PAUL

PETER J. MIRICH

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HIJAZI TANYA

Claimant

NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFO

Defendants and Respondents

FOOD FORWARD INC.

JAMES R. BIRKENSHAW TRUST THE

BIRKENSHAW JJ

BIRKENSHAW J.J.

BIRKENSHAW ANN

BIRKENSHAW JAMES ROBERT

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHINING LAW FIRM

RAMEY CHRISTA HAGGAI

RAMEY JOHN F. ESQ.

FIRM SHINING LAW

Defendant Attorneys

MCCORMICK GREGORY HESS

MILLER WEYD-ANNE N.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

DECLARATION OF AMIR ZAMBRANO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOOD FORWARD, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/2/2018: DECLARATION OF AMIR ZAMBRANO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOOD FORWARD, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF TANYA HIJAZIS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS FOOD FORWARD INC.S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/31/2018: PLAINTIFF TANYA HIJAZIS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS FOOD FORWARD INC.S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Opposition

10/5/2018: Opposition

Other -

10/10/2018: Other -

Opposition

10/11/2018: Opposition

Ex Parte Application

10/11/2018: Ex Parte Application

Reply

10/17/2018: Reply

Motion in Limine

10/29/2018: Motion in Limine

Other -

10/30/2018: Other -

Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits

10/30/2018: Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits

Trial Brief

10/31/2018: Trial Brief

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

11/7/2018: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

SUMMONS

8/31/2016: SUMMONS

FOOD FORWARD, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/27/2016: FOOD FORWARD, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

5/23/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS; ETC.

6/7/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IDENTIFICATION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS; ETC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FORM INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE

6/7/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FORM INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department S29, Peter J. Mirich, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Tanya Hijazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Tanya Hijazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Tanya Hijazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department S29, Peter J. Mirich, Presiding; Jury Trial (In Progress) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Minute Order ((Jury Trial In Progress)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S29, Peter J. Mirich, Presiding; Jury Trial (in progress) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2016
  • NOTICE OF LIEN CLAIM FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION EXPENDITURES (LABOR CODE 3852-3 853, ET AL.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Food Forward, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • FOOD FORWARD, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • FOOD FORWARD, INC.'S CROSSCOMPLAINT AGAINST JAMES ROBERT BIRKENSHAW AKA J.J. BIRKENSHAW; THE JAMES R BIRKENSHAW TRUST; ANN BIRKENSHAW AKA JJ BIRKENSHAW, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Food Forward, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Food Forward, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR INJURY 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISE LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Tanya Hijazi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD is a litigant