This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 21:11:41 (UTC).

TANYA CARTER VS 1024 ROYAL OAKS LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/12/2014 TANYA CARTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1024 ROYAL OAKS LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2715

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CARTER TANYA

Defendants and Respondents

1024 ROYAL OAKS L.P.

AOF/PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORP.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

KORDA GROUP

R.P.K. DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

WHISPERING FOUNTAINS AT MONROVIA THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEN-COHEN LAWYERS PLC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DAVIDIAN LINA S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

11/12/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

SUMMONS

11/12/2014: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/23/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/24/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/2/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/2/2015: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

8/21/2015: Unknown

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

10/1/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Unknown

2/1/2016: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/7/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Receipt Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KORDA GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where 1024 ROYAL OAKS LP DBA WHISPERING FOUNTAINS AT MONROVIA is a litigant

Latest cases where AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where R.P.K. DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant