This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 01:21:54 (UTC).

TANG,HIEU V. VS. NGUYEN, MAI T.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2016 TANG,HIEU filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VS NGUYEN, MAI T. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3267

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TANG HIEU V.

Respondent

NGUYEN MAI T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2016
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Nguyen, Mai ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 10-20-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (fl100, 110, 120, blank fl105, case assign - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu - Signed on 2016-09-04 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (PET & SUM - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu - Service Date on 2016-08-19 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-15-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tang, Hieu ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Notice (of case assignment to DEPT. F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less