This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 14:56:15 (UTC).

TAIT BUCHEN VS IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2008 TAIT BUCHEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD ADLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0114

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD ADLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCHEN TAIT

Defendants

HIRSCH ELISA

IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS INC.

DOES 1-50

NASH VICTOR L. JR.

Not Classified By Court

LUBIN LEE DAVID

Other

MCGARRY JAMES J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIMMELSTEIN MARK STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

PFENNING ROBERT JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding; Conference-Final Status (TRIAL DATE 3/4/09) - Transferred-Limited Jurisdiction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • DocketNotice-Mediation Hrg Date; Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status - Held-Order made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • DocketOrder (of service of trial management order and order to serve trial counsel ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR (09/18/08lee david lubin, mediator) - Non-Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • DocketStatement-Non-Agreement (first sana filed mediation ended in nonagreement ); Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • DocketNotice-Continuance; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding; Non-Calendar Matter (8-19-08 post mediation statusconference continued to 10-20-08.) - Order-Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2008
  • DocketStipulation & Order; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2008
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • DocketAnswer (Elisa Hirsch ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • DocketDemand-Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com (Imagecraft Productions, Inc. ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2008
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com (Elisa Hirsch ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • DocketAnswer (Imagecraft Productions, Inc., and Victor L. Nash, Jr. ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • DocketDemand-Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imagecraft Productions, Inc. is a litigant