This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 21:42:55 (UTC).

SYLVIE MARACCI ET AL VS ASTRUM FUND I LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 SYLVIE MARACCI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASTRUM FUND I LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4159

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GREENBERG ARTHUR A

CARZ SHARON

MARACCI SYLVIE

BAHAR FARHAD

REICH JONATHAN L

FILLEY CAROLE

ONTARIO DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS

GREENBERG ARTHUR A.

REICH JONATHAN I.

Respondents and Defendants

SANLI NEVIN

SANLI PASTORE & HILL

ASTRUM FUND I LP

ASTRUM FUND I GP LP

ASTRUM INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PRYOR CASHMAN LLP

VIDAL THOMAS HENRI

Defendant Attorney

DAVIDOFF BRIAN LESLIE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/6/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Unknown

1/18/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/31/2019: Notice of Ruling

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

9/15/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

9/15/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/20/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF SANLI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INCONVENIENT FORUM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/17/2016: DECLARATION OF SANLI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INCONVENIENT FORUM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INCONVENIENT FORUM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

11/17/2016: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INCONVENIENT FORUM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF IRA STEINBERG

11/17/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF IRA STEINBERG

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INCONVENIENT FORUM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/17/2016: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INCONVENIENT FORUM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service

11/17/2016: Proof of Service

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

12/22/2016: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Minute Order

12/23/2016: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Status Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Astrum Fund I LP (Defendant); Astrum Fund I GP LP (Defendant); Astrum Investment Management (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Motion to Dismiss; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Court Order - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Farhad Bahar (Plaintiff); Carole Filley (Plaintiff); Arthur A. Greenberg (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANLI PASTORE & HILL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDOFF BRIAN L. ESQ.