This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 17:13:28 (UTC).

SYLVESTER STALLONE VS MOHAMED HADID ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2012 SYLVESTER STALLONE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MOHAMED HADID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CESAR C. SARMIENTO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6633

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CESAR C. SARMIENTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STALLONE SYLVESTER

Defendants

CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES AND SERVICES LLC

HADID MOHAMED

HD DEVELOPMENT LLC

Cross Plaintiffs

PARQUET BY DIAN

JOB SITE GLASS & MIRROR

FIRE BY DESIGN

PELAYO JOSE

MONTENEGRO CARLOS

KODIAK CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC.

HARDWOOD FACTORY INC. THE

JW DOOR CORPORATION

HTM ELECTRIC

MATRIX CAB PARTS INC.

DMC PLUMBING CONTRACTORS

NOBLE HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

LG MARBLE AND GRANITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SORRELL PAUL N.

Defendant Attorneys

COOKSEY TOOLEN GAGE DUFFY &WOOG

SHABAZ LAW GROUP APC

WOOG PHIL M.

Other Attorneys

SPRINGEL & FINK

HENDERSON BETH M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Former Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO DEFT. HTM ELECTRIC ONLY; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • at 10:00 am in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding; Jury Trial (@ 4-6 DAYS) - Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (DARLENE MORGAN,CSR#5959 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Opposition; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • Request (MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH,RECORD OR BROADCAST: ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2012
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Reply (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MEMORANDUM IN OPP. TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Opposition (RE EX PARTE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Demurrer (to complaint of Sylvester Stallone memo of points & authorities in support thereof ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATRIX CAB PARTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HARDWOOD FACTORY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KODIAK CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES SERVICES LLC is a litigant