This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 11:44:50 (UTC).

SUZANNE M. DUPEE, M.D. VS CHARLES WATSON ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 04/20/2016 SUZANNE M DUPEE, M D filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLES WATSON . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5733

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUPEE M.D. SUZANNE M.

Defendants

WATSON GINA

WATSON CHARLES F.

WATSON CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JEN LAW FIRM

FIRM JEN LAW

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

6/10/2016: Unknown

Declaration re: Due Diligence

7/6/2016: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Case Management Statement

7/29/2016: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

8/8/2016: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

10/11/2016: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

10/19/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

12/12/2016: Unknown

Unknown

12/12/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

1/17/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

1/23/2017: Unknown

Unknown

4/3/2017: Unknown

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/7/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

7/20/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/6/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

12/6/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

4/24/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by M.D., Suzanne M. Dupee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jen Law Firm (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice; Filed by M.D., Suzanne M. Dupee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER ); Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Memo.of Credits,Acrued Int.,&Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Memo.of Credits,Acrued Int.,&Costs (MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT COSTS-$1,632.00 CREDITS-$0.00 DEC. OF ACC. INT.-$562.52. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Writ issued (WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED IN THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Writ issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice (NOTICE OF FILING OF JUDGMENT LIEN ); Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2016
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Notice; Filed by M.D., Suzanne M. Dupee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8-8-16 8:30 AM DEPT P ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Notice; Filed by M.D., Suzanne M. Dupee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by M.D., Suzanne M. Dupee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC125733    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: P

  TENTATIVE RULING

Suzanne M. Dupee, M.D. v. Charles Watson et al.    Case No.: SC125733

Motion: Motion for Assignment Order (UNOPPOSED)    

Hearing Date: 11/5/2019

Judgment debtor owes judgment creditor $53,481.96 (including interest) pursuant to a judgment entered by this court on December 6, 2017. Creditor moves for an order redirecting all payments from Charles Watson Incorporated to judgment debtor Charles Watson toward repayment of the underlying judgment 

Under Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. §708.510(c), a court may order a judgment debtor to assign to a judgment creditor “all or part of a right to payment due or to become due, whether or not the right is conditioned on future developments.”

Judgment creditor has provided a declaration stating judgment debtors owe a current balance of $53,481.96. The declaration also states judgment debtor Charles Watson owns and operates a business called Charles Watson Incorporated. The motion is unopposed. It is therefore appropriate to redirect any payments that are or may become due from Charles Watson Incorporated toward satisfaction of the judgment.

Judgment creditor also requests that the court order judgment debtor to provide a monthly accounting of Charles Watson Incorporated’s finances until the judgment is satisfied, but fails to provide facts or argument indicating why such an order is necessary.

The motion is therefore GRANTED as to the request for an assignment order but DENIED as to the request for an accounting order.