This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 15:35:34 (UTC).

SUSANA ROSAK ET AL VS PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDI

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 SUSANA ROSAK filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEIRDRE HILL and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1780

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEIRDRE HILL

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ROSAK DAVID

ROSAK MICHAEL

ROSAK KEN

ROSAK SUSANA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-300

PROVIDENT LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL

NAWATHE AMAR. M.D.

JOHN JORDAN M.D. INC. DOE 151

PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL

AVANCED IMAGING OF SOUTH BAY DOE 202

PROVIDNECE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIF.

JOHN E. JORDAN M.D. DOE 1

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIF

AMAR NAWATHE M.D.

Not Classified By Court

JOHN E. JORDAN M.D.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DONAHUE & HORROW LLP

DONAHUE THOMAS E.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PARRETT JAMES R. ESQ.

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD &

KLIMKOWSKI MATTHEW C.

FRANZEN MARK VICTOR

PARRETT JAMES ROBERT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

8/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/22/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/10/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

12/28/2017: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

1/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/7/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/14/2018: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

4/26/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice

12/17/2018: Notice

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

6/13/2019: Ex Parte Application

Order

6/17/2019: Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/27/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/5/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by JOHN E. JORDAN, M.D. (DOE 1) (Defendant); JOHN JORDAN, M.D., INC. (DOE 151) (Defendant); Avanced Imaging of South Bay (Doe 202) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (To Continue Trial); Filed by JOHN E. JORDAN, M.D. (DOE 1) (Defendant); JOHN JORDAN, M.D., INC. (DOE 151) (Defendant); Avanced Imaging of South Bay (Doe 202) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Order (Granting Trial Continuance); Filed by JOHN E. JORDAN, M.D. (DOE 1) (Defendant); JOHN JORDAN, M.D., INC. (DOE 151) (Defendant); Avanced Imaging of South Bay (Doe 202) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial); Filed by JOHN E. JORDAN, M.D. (DOE 1) (Defendant); JOHN JORDAN, M.D., INC. (DOE 151) (Defendant); Avanced Imaging of South Bay (Doe 202) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Answer (to Complaint); Filed by Avanced Imaging of South Bay (Doe 202) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Amar., M.D. Nawathe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Providence Health System-Southern Calif. (Defendant); PROVIDNECE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
173 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Susana Rosak (Plaintiff); David Rosak (Plaintiff); Ken Rosak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Summons; Filed by MICHAEL ROSAK (Plaintiff); Susana Rosak (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL -EXPARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR SUSANA ROSAK GUARDIAN AD LITEM(FAXED) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by MICHAEL ROSAK (Plaintiff); Susana Rosak (Plaintiff); David Rosak (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC641780    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: B

Tentative is to grant.