This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2016 at 23:46:21 (UTC).

SUSAN P. ENG VS. PACIFIC CLINICS

Case Summary

On 11/14/2012 SUSAN P ENG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACIFIC CLINICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are C. EDWARD SIMPSON and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0485

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ENG EK TEK

ENG NANCY ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF

ENG SUSAN P.

ENG VINCENT

ENG VINLY

LIM GET

Defendants

PACIFIC CLINICS DBA ASIAN PACIFIC FAMILY

THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S

THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (GFS GRTD)

THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S (GFS)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIRARDI AND KEESE

Defendant Attorneys

HURRELL & CANTRALL LLP

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

3/11/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: APPLICATION 0F GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

11/21/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: APPLICATION 0F GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENTAS WELL AS FEDERAL COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS DEPUTIES BRIAN VANCE, DANIEL ESQUEDA, JEREMIAH SONG AND ALLISON MELENDEZ? NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

10/4/2013: DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENTAS WELL AS FEDERAL COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS DEPUTIES BRIAN VANCE, DANIEL ESQUEDA, JEREMIAH SONG AND ALLISON MELENDEZ? NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Unknown

8/15/2013: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/4/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS AND COUNTY SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT NOTICE OF REJECTION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION

10/4/2013: DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS AND COUNTY SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT NOTICE OF REJECTION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION

Unknown

8/28/2013: Unknown

Unknown

8/14/2013: Unknown

DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

9/3/2013: DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

10/1/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AMIE S. PARK

9/3/2013: DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AMIE S. PARK

DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AMIE S. PARK;

10/4/2013: DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF?S DEPARTMENT APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AMIE S. PARK;

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

8/6/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order

8/29/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/2/2014: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS? APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

11/15/2013: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS? APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/6/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC CLINICS ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE APP OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • Order (RE DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Rq for Determ of Good Faith Setlmt (RE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Notice (RE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT NOTICE OF REJECTION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Notice-Settlement (RE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT AND FEDERAL COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS DEPUTIES BRIAN VANCE, DANIEL ESQUEDA, JEREMIAH SON AND ALLISON MELENDEZ NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • Notice-Settlement (CONDITIONAL NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE CO. OF LA, LA SHERIFF'S DEPT AND SUSAN P. ENG, VINCENT ENG, VINLY ENG, GETY LIM, EK TEK ENG, NANCY ENG ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • Rq for Determ of Good Faith Setlmt (REJECTED 10/1/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Notice of Hearing Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed (BY MAIL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.