This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2016 at 01:54:11 (UTC).

SUSAN HIGHLEYMAN VS VERIZON CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 11/12/2010 SUSAN HIGHLEYMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VERIZON CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SIRNA, SALVATORE T. and STEVEN D. BLADES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0001

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SIRNA, SALVATORE T.

STEVEN D. BLADES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIGHLEYMAN SUSAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC.

GLOBETEC OF CALIFORNIA INC.

VERIZON CALIFORNIA INC.

Cross Defendant

J&R FERNANDEZ INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOKES BEAU JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

PLACE KEVIN L. ESQ.

CLINTON DAVID A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2011
  • Ord of Disml with prejudice (ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • Notice (OF SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • Notice Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • Amendment to Complaint (J&R FERNANDEZ, INC. (DOE 1) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • Cross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • Notice of Hearing Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (VERIZON CALIFORNIA, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (MASTEC NORTH AMERICA, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (GLOBE TEC OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J&R FERNANDEZ INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOKES BEAU JAMES ESQ.