This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2020 at 00:20:39 (UTC).

SUSAN GLICKMAN VS FAGEN FRIEDMAN & FULFROST LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/18/2011 SUSAN GLICKMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FAGEN FRIEDMAN FULFROST LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES F. PALMER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7639

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHARLES F. PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GLICKMAN SUSAN

Defendants and Respondents

CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS

DOES 1 TO 10

FAGEN FRIEDMAN & FULFROST LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TEMKIN VICKI L.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

HARBER STEPHEN M. ESQ

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/18/2011: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

3/18/2011: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/17/2011: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/24/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/24/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

5/27/2011: SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/27/2011: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/27/2011: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT; TOTAL EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; IMPLIED INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND CONTRIBUTION

5/27/2011: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT; TOTAL EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; IMPLIED INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND CONTRIBUTION

NOTICE OF COUNSELS CHANGE OF ADDRESS

6/7/2011: NOTICE OF COUNSELS CHANGE OF ADDRESS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/6/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/11/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/13/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/25/2011: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12/5/2011: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12/5/2011: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

12/8/2011: Minute Order -

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • Docketat 11:30 am in Department 33, Charles F. Palmer, Presiding; Court Order - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITH PREJUDICE, CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY FAGEN, FRIEDMAN, FULFROST LLP ON 5/27/11 ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketStatement-Agreement (Full) (PRIVATE MEDIATION ); Filed by Mediator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 33, Charles F. Palmer, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON CROSS COMPLAINT; ); Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less