Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 12:30:40 (UTC).

SURVIVORS TRUST VS TIMOTHY J. CARRICK ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2008 SURVIVORS TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TIMOTHY J CARRICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE, DUDLEY W. GRAY II and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7659

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AIRPORT OFFICE CENTER

DIAL KAREN

SURVIVORS TRUST

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CARRICK AND RAMEY

CARRICK TIMOTHY J.

RAMEY JOHN AN INDIVIDUAL

CARRICK AND RANEY LLC

CARRICK AND RAMEY LLP.

RAMEY JOHN

Not Classified By Court

KLINKNER TERESA B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAL VINCENT LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CARRICK & CONRAD APLC

HAGGAI LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

6/11/2012: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT TIMOTHY CARRICK PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (CCP 664.6) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS A4D AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF CHRISTOPHER REAL, KAREN WILLIAMS, KERRY M. KINNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES YC057659 AND BC391 159 (LEAD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 1; Court Order (Court Order; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketNotice; Filed by AIRPORT OFFICE CENTER (Legacy Party); SURVIVORS TRUST (Plaintiff); KAREN DIAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2008
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SURVIVORS TRUST (Plaintiff); KAREN DIAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • DocketSummons; Filed by AIRPORT OFFICE CENTER (Legacy Party); SURVIVORS TRUST (Plaintiff); KAREN DIAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT C. RIPPENTROP, Trustee of the Survivor's Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REAL, VINCENT