This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 13:32:08 (UTC).

SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC VS. GARO KHACHERIAN DBA SPARKLING

Case Summary

On 06/07/2016 SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GARO KHACHERIAN DBA SPARKLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1370

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT LLC

Defendants

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

KHACHERIAN GARO

SPARKLING FRESH POOLS

POOLS SPARKLING FRESH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLAUSEN MILLER P.C.

P.C. CLAUSEN MILLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunstone LA Airport LLC is a litigant