This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 13:55:49 (UTC).

SUNHEE K. WALL VS JUNG SE PARK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2012 SUNHEE K WALL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JUNG SE PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7603

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALL SUNHEE K.

Defendants

JSP ENTERTAINMENT INC.

LEE JEFF SOO

PARK JUNG SE

KIM STEVE S. (DOE 5)

PARK JUNG SAE

TEN PRO LLC (DOE 2)

LEE JEFF

LEE HEEUN (DOE 3)

PARK YEON SI

LEE JAE HYUN (DOE 4)

LEE HYUN SOO

K & T ENTERTAINMENT INC. (DOE 1)

ABOUT KARAOKE

JGP INVESTMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

ABOUT

THE RAIN (DOE 1)

PALACE RESTAURANT (DOE 2)

JGP INVESTMENT INC.

Not Classified By Court

FOSTER THOMAS A.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZLICH & BLUM

Defendant Attorneys

BLAKE RICK LAW OFFICES OF

GONZALEZ ROSENDO ESQ.

YU MATTHEW C. LAW OFFICE OF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-02-17 00:00:00

2/17/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-02-17 00:00:00

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

4/17/2012: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT

8/16/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT

8/16/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

10/17/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY DEFENDAT

3/6/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY DEFENDAT

Answer

3/15/2013: Answer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

7/11/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

8/5/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

12/5/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/6/2013: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2014-03-07 00:00:00

3/7/2014: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2014-03-07 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

5/28/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

7/29/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

8/6/2014: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

8/6/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Judgment

6/15/2015: Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

6/24/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

265 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketRequest For Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department B; Default Prove Up Hearing (Default Prove Up Hearing; Plf to prepare proposed judgment) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-05-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department B; Default Prove Up Hearing (Default Prove Up Hearing; Continued by Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
325 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-02-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sunhee K. Wall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JGP INVESTMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where About, Inc. doing business as Dotdash is a litigant

Latest cases where RAINS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAKE RICK A.