This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 21:12:30 (UTC).

STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC VS CLAIR WIRELESS ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/04/2013 STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLAIR WIRELESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN FARRELL and RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0746

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN FARRELL

RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC

Defendants

CLAIR GLOBAL BROADCAST

CLAIR GLOBAL CORP.

CLAIR WIRELESS AND INTERCOM LLC

DOES 1

PERICH MIKE (INDIVIDUAL)

WIRELESS FIRST

PACIFICO TELEVISION ENGINEERING INC.

PIRICH MIKE (INDIVIDUAL)

DOES 1-100

FEKAS JOHN (DOE 2)

TEMPO CONSULTING INC.

FIRST WIRELESS

PIRICH MIKE

FEKAS JOHN DOE 2

BROADCAST CLAIR GLOBAL

Others

MICHAEL PIRICH

PIRICH MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNER MARK E.

Defendant Attorney

WITTLIN IRWIN MARC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2015
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department Q; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department Q; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department Q; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department Q; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department Q; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion For Summary Judgment; Continued-Department dark) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketSummons-Amended; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2013
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • DocketResponse; Filed by CLAIR WIRELESS AND INTERCOM LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CLAIR WIRELESS AND INTERCOM LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUDIO FACILITIES MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITTLIN IRWIN