This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:09:36 (UTC).

STORYCORP CONSULTING ET AL VS GREENWOOD HALL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/11/2016 STORYCORP CONSULTING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREENWOOD HALL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3256

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WELLS DAVID R.

STORYCORP CONSULTING

Defendants and Respondents

GREENWOOD HALL INC.

PCS LINK INC.

DOES 1 - 5

HALL JOHN R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ALTABET EDWARD D.

FOX GERARD P. ESQ.

PC GERARD FOX LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WOODBURY ROBERT C. ESQ.

ROBERT C. WOODBURY ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

5/9/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEFENDANT JOHN R. HALL'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN R HALL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOHN R. HALL

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEFENDANT JOHN R. HALL'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN R HALL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOHN R. HALL

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT JOHN R. HALL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT

8/2/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT JOHN R. HALL'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

8/3/2018: Minute Order

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

8/28/2018: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR EDWARD A. ALTABET

4/5/2016: NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR EDWARD A. ALTABET

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS PCS LINK, INC.'S, GREENWOOD HALL, INC.'S AND JOHN R. HALL'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

5/4/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS PCS LINK, INC.'S, GREENWOOD HALL, INC.'S AND JOHN R. HALL'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/11/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/30/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TO PLAINTIFFS' DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

7/11/2016: DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TO PLAINTIFFS' DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TO PLAINTIFFS' DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

7/15/2016: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TO PLAINTIFFS' DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIF!ED SHORTHAND REPORTER

7/22/2016: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIF!ED SHORTHAND REPORTER

Minute Order

7/22/2016: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PCS LINK, INC.; GREENWOOD HALL, INC.; AND JOHN R. HALL'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

8/17/2016: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PCS LINK, INC.; GREENWOOD HALL, INC.; AND JOHN R. HALL'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF THOMAS P. BURKE JR. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE, OR ARGUMENT PLAINTIFFS' BROKER-DEALER REGISTRATION STATUSES AS IRRELEVANT, WASTEFUL

5/17/2017: DECLARATION OF THOMAS P. BURKE JR. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE, OR ARGUMENT PLAINTIFFS' BROKER-DEALER REGISTRATION STATUSES AS IRRELEVANT, WASTEFUL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/17/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

REQUEST TO ENTER STIPULATED JUDGMENT

9/11/2017: REQUEST TO ENTER STIPULATED JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT BY COURT ON STIPULATION

10/3/2017: JUDGMENT BY COURT ON STIPULATION

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; (Motion; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by StoryCorp Consulting (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by StoryCorp Consulting (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Greenwood Hall, Inc. (Defendant); John R. Hall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. WOODBURY PURSUANT TO CCP SEC. 430.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR EDWARD A. ALTABET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Notice; Filed by StoryCorp Consulting (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (I); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by StoryCorp Consulting (Plaintiff); David R. Wells (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenwood Hall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where STORYCORP CONSULTING A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODBURY ROBERT