Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 07:16:19 (UTC).

STEVEN NIMEH VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 STEVEN NIMEH filed an Other lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are REX HEESEMAN and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2389

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

REX HEESEMAN

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIMEH STEVEN

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGEE WILLIAM R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ROGANLEHRMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

10/28/2011: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR RESTITUTION AND DAMAGES

10/28/2011: COMPLAINT FOR RESTITUTION AND DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/1/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/7/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/1/2011: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/8/2011: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

12/15/2011: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/5/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/25/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

2/8/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

5/1/2012: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

5/10/2012: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order -

6/11/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

6/20/2012: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/5/2012: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

7/6/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

8/29/2012: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN TILE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/18/2013: DEFENDANT?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN TILE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN TILE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 19; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 19; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Steven Nimeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Steven Nimeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketBMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Steven Nimeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Nimeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR RESTITUTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less