This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 04:16:51 (UTC).

STEVEN MARKOFF ET AL VS BANK OF AMERICA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 STEVEN MARKOFF filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH R. FEFFER, MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, ROBERT L. HESS, ROBERT H. O'BRIEN and MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3212

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

ROBERT L. HESS

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MARKOFF JADWIGA Z

MARKOFF STEVEN

MARKOFF JADWIGA Z.

Defendants and Respondents

BANK OF AMERICA

DOES 1-20

SCHNIEDERS WILLIAM F

BOMAR MARGO

HOLLENBECK MICHAEL W.

WEAVER KIM

DAILY SEAN

SCHEIN MICHELE

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

SCHNIEDERS WILLIAM F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW O/O WILFRED J. KILLIAN

KILLIAN WILFRED JOSEPH

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SEVERSON & WERSON A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

YOSEF DANIEL E.

STASTNY DOUGLAS C

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/9/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

9/17/2014: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/9/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NON SERVICE REPORT

10/23/2014: NON SERVICE REPORT

PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

10/27/2014: PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

11/26/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION.

1/29/2015: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION.

DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

4/13/2015: DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

4/13/2015: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order -

4/24/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

4/27/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/5/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/5/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service -

6/8/2015: Proof of Service -

Minute Order -

6/30/2015: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/23/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF KIM WEAVER.

6/30/2016: PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF KIM WEAVER.

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

8/3/2016: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketOther - (Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Status Summary); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B278071.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
261 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF CONTRACT; BREACH OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; NEGLIGENCE; VIOLATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 17200; INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; NEGLIGENT INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant); William F. Schnieders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant); William F. Schnieders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR: 1.) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Markoff (Plaintiff); Jadwiga Z. Markoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

WILFRED J. KILLIAN, Esq., SB No. 207885

LAW OFFICES OF

WILFRED J. KILLIAN

9903 Santa Monica Blvd.

Suite #510

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

(310) 289-2140/FAX (310) 289-2140

wkillianlaw@yahoo.com

Attorney for PLAINTIFFS STEVEN MARKOFF and JADWIGA Z. MARKOFF

Superior Court of | of Califopn: Ounty of o An:t{g: e

SEP 142016

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

STEVEN MARKOFF, an individual; and JADWIGA Z. MARKOFF, an individual,

PLAINTIFFS,

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., a Delaware corporation, doing business in California; WILLIAM F. SCHNIEDERS; and DOES 1- 20, |

ug? ot et et wat “wgpt e e sttt et “owst ot “autt o’ “omer’

DEFENDANTS.

Case No.: BC 533212

(Related to: Sparks v. Bank of America, Case No.: BC 569359)

PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT’S RULING ON DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR A JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS TO PLAINTIFF’S

COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.

JUDGE: HON. ALLAN J. GOODMAN DATE: September 21, 2016

TIME: 8:30 a.m.

PLACE: Dept. “51”

COMPLAINT FILED: 01/14/14 TRIAL DATE: 4/18/17

TO ALL PARTIES HEREIN AND THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant