This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 13:09:23 (UTC).

STEVEN HARRIS VS VERBUM DEI HIGH SCHOOL ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 STEVEN HARRIS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VERBUM DEI HIGH SCHOOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC MARMARO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2669

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC MARMARO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HARRIS STEVEN

Defendants and Respondents

VDHS WORK STUDY INC.

VERBUM DEI HIGH SCHOOL

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION &

DOES 1 THROUGH 250

MANDALA MICHAEL

ARCHDIOCESE OF L. A. ED. & WEL. CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CARLIN & BUCHSBAUM LLP

CARLIN & BUCHSBAUM LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SULLIVAN BALLOG & WILLIAMS LLP

MEPPEN DEBRA ELLWOOD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/1/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

6/6/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

SUMMONS

6/6/2016: SUMMONS

Unknown

7/12/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

7/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

7/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/21/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

7/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

Unknown

7/29/2016: Unknown

Unknown

7/29/2016: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/19/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

8/19/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT AND PLAINTIFF PATRICIA TINSLEY MUNFORD FOR (1) LIMITED LIFT OF STAY OF ACTION TO ALLOW FOR THIS MOTION TO STRIKE AND TO ENTER THE DEFAULT, ETC., AND (2) (1) TO

8/25/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT AND PLAINTIFF PATRICIA TINSLEY MUNFORD FOR (1) LIMITED LIFT OF STAY OF ACTION TO ALLOW FOR THIS MOTION TO STRIKE AND TO ENTER THE DEFAULT, ETC., AND (2) (1) TO

DEFENIANT VERBUM DEL HIGH SCHOOL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/27/2016: DEFENIANT VERBUM DEL HIGH SCHOOL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/27/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT VDHS WORK STUDY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/28/2016: DEFENDANT VDHS WORK STUDY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

12/20/2016: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/24/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 37; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • at 08:34 AM in Department 37; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 37; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 37; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Steven Harris (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERBUM DEI HIGH SCHOOL is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES THE is a litigant