This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2019 at 22:18:12 (UTC).

STEVEN GRIFFIN VS STUDIO POINTE APTS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2015 STEVEN GRIFFIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STUDIO POINTE APTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4861

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GRIFFIN STEVEN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

STUDIO POINTE APTS INC.

STUDIO POINTE APTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MYBEDBUGLAWYER INC.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JONES KEVIN B. ESQ.

SMITH DAVID CAMPBELL

WOHRLE JOSEPH P. ESQ.

DROZIN GARTH

D'ANGELO BRON E. ESQ.

CAMERON PARRY G.

DROZIN GARTH MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Motion

9/12/2019: Notice of Motion

Trial Brief

9/23/2019: Trial Brief

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/1/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Statement of the Case

10/4/2019: Statement of the Case

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/7/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION OF HELEN MARTINEZ

10/17/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION OF HELEN MARTINEZ

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 3

7/5/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 3

Minute Order -

6/12/2018: Minute Order -

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/16/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Opposition - Defendants' Objection and Opposition to Plaintiff's Improper Motion to Transfer Case

2/1/2019: Opposition - Defendants' Objection and Opposition to Plaintiff's Improper Motion to Transfer Case

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 2

5/13/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 2

SUMMONS -

6/12/2015: SUMMONS -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

6/14/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

Substitution of Attorney -

12/14/2016: Substitution of Attorney -

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

5/11/2017: OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

7/13/2017: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • Hearing11/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Hearing11/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Hearing11/06/2019 at 13:30 PM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (Page and Line Designations of Deposition of Helen Martinez); Filed by Steven Griffin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (Line and Page Designation of Deposition of Helen Martinez); Filed by Steven Griffin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULINGS ON DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DR. DARVISH AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF A DISCOVERY REFEREE, AND ON PLAINTIFF?S CONCURRENT MOTION FOR DISCOVERY REFEREE; Filed by Studio Pointe Apts, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; Filed by Studio Pointe Apts, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMSC Brief; Filed by Studio Pointe Apts, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Studio Pointe Apts Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Studio Pointe Apts Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT , STUDIO POINTE APTS., INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Steven Griffin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY (VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 1941.1); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Griffin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC584861    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO RECLASSIFY

On June 12, 2015, plaintiff Steven Griffin (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Studio Pointe Apts, LLC (“Defendant”) for injuries and damages relating to alleged bedbug and cockroach infestations and uninhabitable living conditions of a residential apartment complex. Defendant moves to reclassify this case as a limited civil case.

A motion to reclassify an unlimited civil case as a limited civil case may be granted only if the court determines that the plaintiff’s claim necessarily involves less than $25,000.00—that a greater recovery “could not be obtained” or is “virtually unobtainable.” (Walker v. Superior Court (1991) 53 Cal.3d 257, 269-270.) In ruling on a motion to reclassify, the Court may not properly “trespass into the province of the trier of fact” and in particular, “pain and suffering are not subject to precise measurement by any scale and their translation into money damages is peculiarly the function of the trier of facts.” (Maldonado v. Superior Court (1996) 45 Cal.App.4th 397, 401-402 [“The unlikeliness of a judgment in excess of $25,000 is not the test”].) The Court cannot value a plaintiff’s pain and suffering, which would necessitate their translation into money damages, which is the function for the factfinder. (Walker, supra, 53 Cal.3d at p. 26.; Maldonado, supra, 45 Cal.App.4th at p. 401.)

A motion for reclassification must be made within the time allowed for that party to amend the initial pleading or to respond to the initial pleading. (Code Civ. Proc., § 403.040, subd. (a).) If a party files a motion for reclassification after the time for that party to respond to a complaint, the court shall grant the motion and enter an order for reclassification only if both of the following conditions are satisfied: (1) the case is incorrectly classified; (2) the moving party shows good cause for not seeking reclassification earlier. (Code Civ. Proc., § 403.040, subd. (b).)

Defendant contends Plaintiff will not recover damages in excess of $25,000 because Plaintiff served a section 998 offer to compromise in 2016 for $10,000. Defendant argues Plaintiff does not provide evidence of medical special damages or loss of earnings and will not be able to prevail because there are no City or County violation notices.

Plaintiff argues in opposition that the action seeks punitive and emotional distress damages valued above the $25,000 threshold. Plaintiff contends he recently demanded $183,200 at a private mediation, and that his mental and emotional distress continues to the present. Defendant does not address Plaintiff’s mental and emotional distress damages on reply.

Defendant also does not explain why it did not seek reclassification earlier. This case is nearly four and a half years old, with a trial date in two weeks. It is now time for this case to go to trial.

Based on this record, Court cannot find, as a matter of law, that the case will necessarily result in a verdict below $25,000 and that Defendant showed good cause for not seeking reclassification earlier. Accordingly, the motion to transfer the case to limited jurisdiction court is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.