This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 10:51:13 (UTC).

STEVE PARK, ET AL VS. SUNG KIL CHOI, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2015 STEVE PARK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUNG KIL CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4282

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

PARK STEVE

YANG YOUNG SOOK

KIM NAM SOO

PARK SHIN OAK

YANG HO JIN AKA HOKIN YANG

KIM CHOON JA

KIM HI WON

PARK BONG WOO AKA ANGIE PARK

KIM DONG HAE AKA CALEB KIM

KIM NAM SOO AKA NAN SOO KIM

PARK TAE SUK

YANG HO JIN

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

CHOI SUNG KIL

CHANG KOON RAE

CHO KAP SUNG

LOS ANGELES DONGSAN CHURCH

LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION

HAN HI YOUNG

HAN KI HYUNG

HAN HI YOUNG [BISHOP]

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ERIC IBISI

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KAREN E. JUNG

GERARD FOX LAW P.C.

CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE

BETETA DOUGLAS JOSE

SPANIAC KATHARINE LYNN

HALAS ERIN ALISHA

MOON & DORSETT PC

DORSETT DANA MOON ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JUNG KAREN EUNKYUNG

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

12/22/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/9/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/29/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/10/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/11/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CLERK?S NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL -RECLASSIFICATION

6/17/2016: CLERK?S NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL -RECLASSIFICATION

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/17/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS SUNG CHOI, KOON RAE CHANG, AND KAP SUNG CHO TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/17/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS SUNG CHOI, KOON RAE CHANG, AND KAP SUNG CHO TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/17/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF CROSS- COMPLAINANT HI YOUNG HAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANT TAE SILK PA

6/17/2016: DECLARATION OF CROSS- COMPLAINANT HI YOUNG HAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANT TAE SILK PA

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

10/3/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST NAM SOO KIM

10/19/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST NAM SOO KIM

REPLY OF DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUNG KIL CHOI TO CROSS-DEFENDANT NAM SOO KIM'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO. 1, AND REQUEST FOR MONTARY SANC

1/24/2017: REPLY OF DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUNG KIL CHOI TO CROSS-DEFENDANT NAM SOO KIM'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO. 1, AND REQUEST FOR MONTARY SANC

Minute Order

5/11/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY IN

7/26/2017: DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY IN

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/15/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ETC

10/20/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ETC

161 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Nam Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information (and Firm Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (Re Stay of Action pending Resolution of Appeal and Case Management Conference); Filed by Los Angeles Dong San Church Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order ((CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Nam Soo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
333 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DECLARATION OF KAREN E. JUNG IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF CROSS- COMPLAINANTS KI HYUNG HAN, HI YOUNG HAN, AND LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST CROSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION OF KI HYUNG HAN, HI YOUNG HAN, AND LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST CROSS- DEFENDANT TAE SUK PARK; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DECLARATION OF CROSS- COMPLAINANT BISHOP KI HYUNG HAN IN SUPPORT OF LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST (1) CROSS- DEFENDANT NAM S00 KIM,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DECLARATION OF YOUNG JO JEONG IN SUPPORT OF LOS ANGELES DONG SAN CHURCH CORPORATION S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST (1) CROSS-DEFENDANT NAM SOO KIM,; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DECLARATION OF KAREN JONES RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST (1) CROSS-DEFENDANT NAM SOO KIM,; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC624282    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 26

On December 9, 2019, Dana M. Dorsett (“Counsel”), filed the instant motions to be relieved as counsel for Cross-Complainant LA Dong San Church Corporation (“Client”).

Counsel has filed a form MC051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1362.

The MC-052 form states that Counsel served Client via mail at Client’s last known mailing address which Counsel states she has confirmed as current within 30 days of the motion by conversation with associate pastor, Hyechong An.

Counsel states that there has been a break down in the attorney-client relationship because Client has failed to pay and continues to refuse to pay attorney’s fees due and a breakdown of communications such that Counsel cannot effectively and competently represent Client.

Counsel is ordered to appear at the hearing and submit corrected MC-051 and MC-052 forms as well as a corrected proposed order on form MC-053. Provided that such corrected forms are submitted, based on the declaration filed by Counsel, the Court is inclined to grant the motions. However, the motions and declarations on forms MC-051 and MC-052 and the proposed order on form MC-053 have not been properly completed.

Counsel is responsible for determining if there are any other hearings scheduled or due dates for discovery for this case, including any motions hearings, which must all be listed in the proposed order. For each hearing, Counsel must state the date, time, and location of the hearing (“111 N. Hill Street, Dept. 26, Los Angeles, CA 90012”). For each due date for discovery, Counsel must identify the nature of the discovery responses that are outstanding, the due date, and the address where verified responses must be sent.

The Court notes that while a corporation has the capacity to bring a lawsuit because it has all the powers of a natural person in carrying out its business, under a long-standing common law rule of procedure, a corporation, unlike a natural person, cannot represent itself before courts of record in propria persona, nor can it represent itself through a corporate officer, director or other employee who is not an attorney. (CLD Const., Inc. v. City of San Ramon (2004) 120 Cal.App.4th 1141, 1145.) “[A Corporation] must be represented by licensed counsel in proceedings before courts of record. (Id.; Gutierrez v. G & M Oil Co., Inc. (2010) 184 Cal.App.4th 551, 564; Thomas G. Ferruzzo, Inc. v. Superior Court (1980) 104 Cal.App.3d 501, 503.) However, “[a]n attorney may be allowed to withdraw without offending the rule against corporate self-representation.” (Thomas G. Ferruzzo, Inc., supra, 104 Cal.App.3d at 504.)

In light of these authorities, the Court will require that LA Dong San Church Corporation timely retain new counsel and file a substitution of counsel within 10 days of service of the signed order (MC-053) so that new counsel will be prepared for trial by the current trial date. The court hereby sets an OSC regarding status of LA Dong San Church Corporation’s representation for February 19, 2020 at 8:30 am in Department 26. LA Dong San Church Corporation is ordered to appear on February 19, 2020 with its new counsel, who should be prepared to address counsel’s readiness for trial by the current trial date.

If LA Dong San Church Corporation fails to file a substitution of counsel within 14 days of service of the signed order, LA Dong San Church Corporation is ordered to appear on February 19, 2020 at 8:30 am in Department 26 and show cause why LA Dong San Church Corporation’s cross-complaint should not be dismissed. LA Dong San Church Corporation’s failure to appear on February 19, 2020 at 8:30 am in Department 26 shall be deemed consent to: dismissal of LA Dong San Church Corporation’s cross-complaint.

The proposed orders (MC-053) are corrected to add the following language to item 9: “Failure to appear at trial will result in dismissal of the cross-complaint.

The corrected Orders are signed and filed, and Counsel is relieved as counsel of record for LA Dong San Church Corporation, effective only upon Counsel’s filing of the proofs of service of the signed Orders upon LA Dong San Church Corporation. Counsel will remain the attorney of record until Counsel files proof of service of the signed order on all parties, including LA Dong San Church Corporation.

Counsel is ordered to serve copies of the instant order and the signed form MC-053 order on all parties, including LA Dong San Church Corporation, and file proof of service of such within 3 days.