Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2017 at 11:31:54 (UTC).

STEPHEN H. PILLMAN VS. WHITTLEY ARMS COOPERATIVE, INC.,ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2010 STEPHEN H PILLMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WHITTLEY ARMS COOPERATIVE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN and ROY L. PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3448

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

ROY L. PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PILLMAN STEPHEN H.

Defendants

WHITTLEY ARMS ASSOCIATION INC.

WHITTLEY ARMS COOPERATIVE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MUNCY ELBERT W. JR.

TREDWAYM LUMSDAINE & DOYLE LLC(ROYJIMENEZ

CONSUMER ACTION LAW (YELENA GUREVICH)

EDWARD C IP AND ASSOC

Defendant Attorneys

THE JUDGE LAW FIRM A.L.C.

BURNS SCHALDENBRAND & RODRIGUEZ

SLAUGHTER & REAGAN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2017
  • Notice of Ruling (PLNTF PILLMANL TAKI 2-14-17 NTC OF RULING ( RE GRANTING DEFT MO TO W.DRAW) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Order (ORDER GRANTING ATTYS MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (FILED ON BEHALF OF PLTF, STEPHEN H. PILLMAN'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, YELENA GUREVICH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Motion (PLTNS MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; CORRECTION OF GRANT DEED; ATTY FEES AND COSTS; DECL OF STEPHAN PILLMAN; PROPOSED ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Notice-Related Cases (DEFT - WHITLEY ARMS ASSOC NTC OF RELATED CASE 16K12933 WHITLEY VS PILLMAN DEPT 77 MOSK 10/24/16 16K13172 WHITLEY VS PILLMAN 10-24-16) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (SUZANNE ONUKI CSR: 13734 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Reply (PLTF - PILLMAN ; TORI TAKI PLNTF PILLMAN'S REPLY TODEFT WHI TLEY ARMS ASSOC INC'S OPP TO PLTF' S MO TO CONSOL NC043448 AND NC060350 11-22-16) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Substitution of Attorney (PLNTF- STEPHEN PILLMAN SUB OF ATTY PLNTF STEPHEN PILLMAN SUBS OUT TREDWAY LUMSDAINE AND SUBS IN YELENA GUREVICH IF CONSUMER ACTION LAW GRP) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2010
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint (OF WHITTLEY ARMS COOPERATIVE,INC. AND WHITTLEY ARMS ASSOCIATION, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • Proof of Service (SERVED _ WHITTLEY ARMS COOPERATIVE INC. RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFECTIVE: THE LAST NAME OF PERSON SERVED ARE NOT IDENTIFIED. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • Proof of Service (SERVED - WHITTLEY ARMS ASSOC.,INC. RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT DEFECTIVE: THE LAST NAME & TITLE OF PERSON SERVED IS ARE NOT IDENTIFIED. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • Summons Filed (RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CMC. SENT TO 88C ON 8/16/10) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED - WHITTLEY ARMS COOPERATIVE INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: NC043448    Hearing Date: September 15, 2020    Dept: S27

  1. Background Facts

    Plaintiff, Stephen H. Pillman filed this action against Defendants, Whittley Arms Cooperative, Inc. and Whittley Arms Association, Inc. (“WAA”) for breach of settlement. The Court granted judgment in favor of WAA on 6/21/17. Plaintiff appealed, and the Court of Appeals affirmed. The Court of Appeals issued its Remittitur on 1/31/20; the Remittitur included an express statement that WAA was to recover its attorneys’ fees.

  2. Motion for Attorneys’ Fees

    WAA moves to recover its attorneys’ fees incurred on appeal, as well as fees incurred in connection with this motion for attorneys’ fees. It seeks to recover fees in the total amount of $21,177.50. It supports its motion with the declaration of its attorney, Steven R. Napoles.

    Plaintiff opposes the motion. Plaintiff does not contest Defendant’s right to recover fees, but does argue the amount sought is unreasonable. Specifically, Plaintiff challenges:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTLEY ARMS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELBERT W MUNCY