This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 09:44:29 (UTC).

STEPHEN FORDE VS. STEVE HAWRYLACK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2016 STEPHEN FORDE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STEVE HAWRYLACK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STUART M. RICE, ROBERT B. BROADBELT, RAMONA G. SEE and MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1096

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STUART M. RICE

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

RAMONA G. SEE

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Appellants

FORDE STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL

FORDE STEPHEN

DOES 1-100

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

CAROL UNRUH

ANY PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

UNRUH CAROL G.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DEW INVESTMENTS LLC A LIMTIED LIABILITY

TAYLOR RANDY AN INDIVIDUAL

TAYLOR REYNA AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

HAWRYLACK STEVE AN INDIVIDUAL

TADROS RAMZI AN INDIVIDUAL

HAWRYLACK STEVE

MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY LLC

FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

TAYLOR REYNA

DEW INVESTMENTS LLC

DELMAN VUKMANOVIC LLP

Respondents, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

UNRUH CAROL G.

HAWRYLACK STEVE

MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY LLC

TAYLOR REYNA

DEW INVESTMENTS LLC

Other

SINGER KEVIN

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAROL UNRUH

MENKE LAW FIRM APC (BRUCE R. MENKE)

MENKE BRUCE ROBERT

Appellant Attorney

JOSEFSBERG HENRY JOACHIM

Defendant Attorneys

BEROKIM & DUEL

PATRICIA L. SWATT

DELMAN VUKMANOVIC LLP (JOHN VUKMANOVIC)

BEROKIM KOUSHA

VUKMANOVIC JOHN VUKMANOVIC LLP JOHN

Other Attorneys

SWATT PATRICIA LYNN

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

4/19/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/2/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/6/2016: Legacy Document

Declaration

7/8/2016: Declaration

Minute Order

10/14/2016: Minute Order

Legacy Document

1/18/2017: Legacy Document

Request for Judicial Notice

3/9/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/9/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Legacy Document

1/11/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

1/18/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/3/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

5/31/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

6/11/2018: Minute Order

Report of Receiver

7/12/2018: Report of Receiver

Request for Judicial Notice

7/17/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/21/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

8/21/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

2/4/2019: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

221 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Appeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference) of 04/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by DEW INVESTMENTS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice (Respondents Notice Electing to Use an Appendix); Filed by DEW INVESTMENTS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
454 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • Proof of Service by Mail (22634 Maple Ave. Torrance CA); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Notice-Pending Action; Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Proof of Service by Mail (22704 Maple Ave. Torrance CA); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less