This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 00:47:48 (UTC).

STEPHEN FORDE VS BROADRIDGE CORPORATE ISSUER

Case Summary

On 12/01/2015 STEPHEN FORDE filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against BROADRIDGE CORPORATE ISSUER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0983

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORDE STEPHEN

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

ABBVIE INC

ALTRIA CONSUMER ENGAGEMENT SERVICES

BAXTER LABORATORIES INC

BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY

BROADRIDGE CORPORATE ISSUER SOLUTIONS

COMPUTERSHARE INC.

DOES 1-20

EMERSON ELECTRICAL CO

JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES INC.

MCDONALD'S CORPORATION

MERCK ENTERPRISES INC .

MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

PHIZER INC

THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY

WELLS FARGO SHAREOWNER SERVICES

BARNEY MORGAN STANLEY SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MENKE LAW FIRM

FIRM MENKE LAW

Defendant Attorney

BARTON KLUGMAN & OETTING LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • ExParte Application; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2015
  • Reply; Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Response; Filed by WELLS FARGO SHAREOWNER SERVICES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • ExParte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by STEPHEN FORDE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.