Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 09:50:40 (UTC).

STEPHEN BINGHAM ET AL VS SALIENT SECURITY SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2015 STEPHEN BINGHAM filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SALIENT SECURITY SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5431

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BINGHAM STEPHEN

RAI JOE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

SALIENT ARMS INTERNATIONAL

SALIENT SECURITY SERVICES INC.

AARON CHAVEZ

ADRIAN CHAVEZ

SALIENT ARMS INTERNATIONAL INC.

SALIENT ARMS INTERNATIONAL LLC

CHAVEZ ADRIAN

CHAVEZ AARON

SALIENT SECURITY SERVICES INC. DBA SALIENT ARMS INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SAFARIAN & BAROIAN LLP

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HALL TIMOTHY A.

HALL TIMOTHY ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/11/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/12/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

3/12/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

SUMMONS

3/12/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/13/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/6/2015: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/10/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/10/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND RE-SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/25/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND RE-SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS, HARRY A. SAFARIAN, IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

1/18/2017: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS, HARRY A. SAFARIAN, IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

NOTICE OF RULING AT EX PARTE HEARING ON JANUARY 18, 2017

1/31/2017: NOTICE OF RULING AT EX PARTE HEARING ON JANUARY 18, 2017

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

5/1/2017: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order

8/23/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURT'S RULING RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

8/28/2017: NOTICE OF COURT'S RULING RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

9/8/2017: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order

10/5/2017: Minute Order

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Bankruptcy/Trial Setting Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Bankruptcy/Trial Setting Co...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Bankruptcy/Trial Setting Conference) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Bankruptcy Trial Setting Co...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Salient Security Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Salient Security Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DEFENDANT SALIENT SECURITY SERVICES INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Stephen Bingham (Plaintiff); Joe Rai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Stephen Bingham (Plaintiff); Joe Rai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC575431    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 74

BC575431 STEPHEN BINGHAM ET AL VS SALIENT SECURITY SERVICES INC

Timothy A. Hall, Esq., counsel for Defendants Salient Security Services, Salient Arms International, Aaron Chavez and Adrian Chavez Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Hall is relieved as counsel as of the date of service of the order on this motion. Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salient Security Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Salient Arms International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL TIMOTHY A