This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 09:04:00 (UTC).

STEPHANIE FRYSLIE VS HABER CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2013 STEPHANIE FRYSLIE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HABER CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON and MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6222

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FRYSLIE STEPHANIE

Defendants and Respondents

HABER CORPORATION CERTIFIED PUBLIC AC

HABER GARY

WICKER PATTY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HABER CORPORATION CERTIFIED PUBLIC AC-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID R. DENIS P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/20/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

SUMMONS

5/20/2013: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

5/31/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

5/31/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

5/31/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS HABER CORPORATION, CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS; PATTY WICKER AND GARY HABER TO COMPLAINT

6/14/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS HABER CORPORATION, CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS; PATTY WICKER AND GARY HABER TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/19/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

8/15/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ANSWERS FROM PLAINTIFF STEPHANIE FRYSLIE; ETC

1/24/2014: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ANSWERS FROM PLAINTIFF STEPHANIE FRYSLIE; ETC

DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ANSWERS FROM PLAINTIFF

1/24/2014: DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ANSWERS FROM PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF VARIOUS DOCUMENTS

1/24/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF VARIOUS DOCUMENTS

DEFENDANTS? EX PI4RTE APPLICATION TO (1) CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE (2) FOR AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ANSWERS FROM PLAINTIFF IN FEBRUARY OR

1/29/2014: DEFENDANTS? EX PI4RTE APPLICATION TO (1) CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE (2) FOR AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION ANSWERS FROM PLAINTIFF IN FEBRUARY OR

Minute Order -

1/29/2014: Minute Order -

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MANDITORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/5/2014: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MANDITORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

3/5/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/19/2014: Minute Order -

STATEMENT OF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND STIPULATION

3/20/2014: STATEMENT OF POLICIES AND PROCEDURES FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND STIPULATION

Minute Order -

3/20/2014: Minute Order -

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 74, Teresa Sanchez-Gordon, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice/ Entire Action ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Docketat 09:30 am in Department 74, Teresa Sanchez-Gordon, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (STATEMENT OF POLICIES AND PRO- CEDURES FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND STIPULATION ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 74, Teresa Sanchez-Gordon, Presiding; Motion to Compel - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketNotice (TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO ANSWER OFF CALENDAR ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTI OF MSC ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Docketat 10:30 am in Department 74, Teresa Sanchez-Gordon, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Hearing prev advanced & vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 74, Teresa Sanchez-Gordon, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Docketat 01:31 pm in Department 90A, Matthew St. George, Presiding; Hearing-Re:Court Fees (O/C - FEES PAID) - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver After Hrg; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HABER CORPORATION CERTIFIED PUBLIC AC is a litigant