Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:11:16 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO VS RODNEY CAULTON

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODNEY CAULTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6825

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH V

CAULTON RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KALPAKIAN STEPHEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/12/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

11/27/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-04-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Rodney Caulton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Rodney Caulton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALPAKIAN STEPHEN