This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 17:27:02 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO VS CORI PIERSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2012 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CORI PIERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6714

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendants and Respondents

O'LOUGHLIN SHAVONNE

PIERSON CORI

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WADE EDMOND D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

6/15/2012: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

6/15/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/3/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/13/2012: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF RULING

8/1/2012: NOTICE OF RULING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/1/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

9/17/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/1/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/10/2012: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

10/10/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

Minute Order -

10/15/2012: Minute Order -

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

10/16/2012: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

10/18/2012: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

Minute Order -

12/10/2012: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/13/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

2/13/2013: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

Minute Order -

3/11/2013: Minute Order -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; (Order to Show Cause; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-04-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketMemorandum-Judgment; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-07-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADE EDMOND D. ESQ.