This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 20:33:38 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS DANCO INC

Case Summary

On 07/28/2015 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DANCO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9431

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

DANCO INC

DOES 1-20

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WATKINS & LETOFSKY LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LIEDLE LOUNSBERY LARSON & LIDL LLP

LIEDLE MATTHEW J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/28/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

7/28/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/21/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DANCO, INC.

9/3/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DANCO, INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND PROOF OF SERVICE

11/4/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Minute Order

3/9/2016: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

3/9/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Minute Order

3/11/2016: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • at 08:31 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 91; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • at 04:00 pm in Department 91, David Sotelo, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 91; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Informal Discovery Conference-PI; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • at 11:00 am in Department 91, David Sotelo, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference-PI (TRANSF TO DEPT M, TORRANCE COURT) - Case is reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Danco, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.