This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 09:34:15 (UTC).

STACY MANDELBERG, ET AL VS SHARON BLAKE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/23/2012 STACY MANDELBERG filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against SHARON BLAKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ and ADR NEUTRAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8319

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

ADR NEUTRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MANDELBERG ARTHUR

MANDELBERG STACEY

MANDELBERG STACY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BLAKE SHARON

FIGGE LESLIE

LOS ANGELES CHILDREN'S RIDING CENTER INC

RORABAUGH ERIN

SHARLANA FARMS INC.

ERIN RORABAUGH

DR. ROBERT BRADLEY

LOS ANGELES EQUINE HOSPITAL INC.

DVM

SUSAN STILLMAN

GEORGE FIGGE DOING BUSINESS AS

Interested Parties and Not Classified By Court

LAURA EHRENHALT

LAW OFFICES OF RONNI L. PAER

MORIN DANNY T. ESQ.

Other

SKAPIK LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCART RACHEL KOSMAL

EQUINE LEGAL SOLUTIONS PC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAMRICK A. RAYMOND III

WALLACE & SCHWARTZ

BYRON G. DANELL

SELMAN & BREITMAN

GF LAW PRACTICE

MOORE WINTER SKEBBA & MCLENNAN L.L.P.

NCNALLY LAW GROUP

RONNI L. PAER

RYAN DATOMI & FLORES

BYRON G. DANELL 225183

MCCURDY & LEIBL

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

6/19/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SHARON BLAKE AND DEFENDANT SHARLANA FARMS, INC., ONLY ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SHARON BLAKE AND SHARLANA FARMS, INC., ONLY ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Certificate - Misc. (OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Order (GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Certificate - Misc. (OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Reply in Support Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Declaration (OF RACHEL E. KOSMAL MCCART, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Opposition (TO PLTF'S DEMURRER TO THE CROSS- COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Notice of Continuance (OF HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RE- LIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Certificate - Misc. Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
627 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2012
  • Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Demurrer Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Proof of Service (summons and complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.