This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 03:18:39 (UTC).

ST THOMAS THE APOSTLE CATHOLIC CHURCH VS GUTIERREZ, SILVIA

Case Summary

On 10/15/2015 ST THOMAS THE APOSTLE CATHOLIC CHURCH filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against GUTIERREZ, SILVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODSON, CAROL BOAS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8087

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GOODSON, CAROL BOAS

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ST THOMAS THE APOSTLE

ST. THOMAS THE APOSTLE

Respondent

GUTIERREZ SILVIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MACCHIAGODENA MARINA ANGELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2015
  • at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2C, Goodson, Carol Boas, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney (- Filed and Entered on 2015-11-23 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (WV130 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Proof of Service (RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT/ WORKPLACE - On Behalf of: Petitioner: st Thomas, The Apostle - Service Date on 2015-11-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2C, Goodson, Carol Boas, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Order (CH116 - Granted on 2015-11-05 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Proof of Service (RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT (WORKPLACE VIOLENCE) - On Behalf of: Petitioner: st Thomas, The Apostle - Service Date on 2015-10-29 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: st Thomas, The Apostle ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Notice - Hearing (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: st Thomas, The Apostle ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: st Thomas, The Apostle ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Petition - Workplace Violence (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: st Thomas, The Apostle ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less