Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 17:52:42 (UTC).

SPLENDID MEDIEN A G VS DAVID GLASSER

Case Summary

On 02/11/2010 SPLENDID MEDIEN A G filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID GLASSER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS, MATTHEW ST. GEORGE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0801

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPLENDID MEDIEN A.G.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

GLASSER DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHENEY BRENT G.

REYNOLDS JEREMIAH T

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

1/29/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

2/28/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Proof of Service -

4/23/2018: Proof of Service -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RESCHEDULE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PRO...)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RESCHEDULE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PRO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RESCHEDULE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PRO...) OF 07/30/2019

7/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RESCHEDULE MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PRO...) OF 07/30/2019

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT

8/22/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

1/17/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ - Return

2/28/2020: Writ - Return

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/28/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN - NO WRIT RETURN ATTACHMENT

6/17/2020: Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN - NO WRIT RETURN ATTACHMENT

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)

7/16/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION

10/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

10/10/2012: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • Hearing12/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by A.G. Splendid Medien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder (ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION); Filed by A.G. Splendid Medien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION); Filed by A.G. Splendid Medien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by A.G. Splendid Medien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by A.G. Splendid Medien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Orange)); Filed by A.G. Splendid Medien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SIIM!4ONS & COMPIAIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by A.G. Splendid Medien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC430801    Hearing Date: January 14, 2021    Dept: 24

Plaintiff/Judgment Creditor Splendid Medien, A.G.’s motion for an order charging Defendant/Judgment Debtor David Glasser’s membership interest in 101 Studios, LLC is GRANTED.

This is a post-judgment matter; judgment was first entered by this Court on June 29, 2010, in favor of Plaintiff and Judgment Creditor Splendid Medien, A.G. (“Splendid”) and against Defendant and Judgment Debtor David Glasser (“Glasser”), in the amount of $134,388.70. The judgment was later amended, pursuant to Stipulation, on August 22, 2019 in the amount of $286,000.00, and renewed on April 10, 2020 in the amount of $274,138.48, inclusive of accrued interest, Court approved attorneys’ fees and costs, and credit for payments made to date.

On December 16, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant motion for an Order Charging Defendant/Judgment Debtor’s Membership Interest in 101 Studios, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (“101 Studios”). On December 31, 2020, Defendant filed an opposition. On January 7, 2021, Plaintiff filed a reply.

Legal Standard

CCP section 708.310 provides that “[i]f a money judgment is rendered against a partner or member but not against the partnership or limited liability company, the judgment debtor’s interest in the partnership or limited liability company may be applied toward the satisfaction of the judgment by an order charging the judgment debtor’s interest pursuant to Section 17705.03 of the Corporations Code.” CCP section 708.320 requires service of the motion on either: (1) All partners or the partnership, or (2) All members or the limited liability company.

Per Corp. Code section 17705.03:

“(a) On application by a judgment creditor of a member or transferee, a court may enter a charging order against the transferable interest of the judgment debtor for the unsatisfied amount of the judgment. A charging order constitutes a lien on a judgment debtor's transferable interest and requires the limited liability company to pay over to the person to which the charging order was issued any distribution that would otherwise be paid to the judgment debtor. 

(b) To the extent necessary to effectuate the collection of distributions pursuant to a charging order in effect under subdivision (a), the court may do any of the following: 

(1) Appoint a receiver of the distributions subject to the charging order, with the power to make all inquiries the judgment debtor might have made. 

(2) Make all other orders necessary to give effect to the charging order. 

(3) Upon a showing that distributions under a charging order will not pay the judgment debt within a reasonable time, foreclose the lien and order the sale of the transferable interest. The purchaser at the foreclosure sale obtains only the transferable interest, does not thereby become a member, and is subject to Section 17705.02.   

(c) At any time before foreclosure under paragraph (3) of subdivision (b), the member or transferee whose transferable interest is subject to a charging order under subdivision (a) may extinguish the charging order by satisfying the judgment and filing a certified copy of the satisfaction with the court that issued the charging order. 

(d) At any time before foreclosure under paragraph (3) of subdivision (b), a limited liability company or one or more members whose transferable interests are not subject to the charging order may pay to the judgment creditor the full amount due under the judgment and thereby succeed to the rights of the judgment creditor, including the charging order. 

(e) This title does not deprive any member or transferee of the benefit of any exemption laws applicable to the member's or transferee's transferable interest. 

(f) This section provides the exclusive remedy by which a person seeking to enforce a judgment against a member or transferee may, in the capacity of judgment creditor, satisfy the judgment from the judgment debtor's transferable interest.”  

Discussion

The Court finds that the supplemental declaration provides a sufficient showing that Defendant owns holds a 17.79% membership interest in 101 Studios. Plaintiff provides the LLC Agreement signed by Glasser as a member and manager, which affirms Glasser is Chief Executive Officer of 101 Studios and has a 17.79 percent membership interest. (Suppl. Reynolds Decl. ¶¶3-5, Exs. H, I.) The LLC Agreement was produced in this litigation pursuant to a Subpoena issued by counsel for Splendid, and Glasser was provided with the document simultaneously with counsel for Splendid. (Id.) This is substantial evidence of his membership interest.

Further, the Court finds that the amended proposed order declaration addresses the issues raised by Defendant. However, the Court will delete the extraneous “costs” language in paragraph 2. As Plaintiff recognizes, costs may be added to the principal judgment through a separately filed Memorandum of Costs After Judgment or a Costs Motion. Considering this, the second paragraph would already require payment of any appropriately brought costs through the “amount remaining due on the judgment” language. Thus, the Court will delete the extraneous language beginning with “and all costs incurred…”

Accordingly, Plaintiff’s motion is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHENEY BRENT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS JEREMIAH