This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 21:34:35 (UTC).

SOUTH BAY STORAGE LLC VS GARY MONROE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/19/2016 SOUTH BAY STORAGE LLC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against GARY MONROE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1308

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOUTH BAY STORAGE LLC

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RICHMOND PLASTERING INC.

LYONS & CO. USA INCORPORATED

GARY MONROE INC.

MONROE GARY FRANKLIN

GMI CONSTRUCTION SERVICES

MCELROY METAL MILL INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

T.J.M. GLAZING INC.

GOLD ARC INC. DBA PASCO GLAZING

CSD QUALITY GLASS & MIRROR INC. DOE 1

CONCRETE CONNECTION INC.

SOUTHWEST V-DITCH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOE 9

HORIZON LATHING INC.

S & S DEVELOPMENT

CSD QUALITY GLASS & MIRROR INC.

ZOE 8 SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY DBA MARK COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOES 1 THROUGH 50

Others

MURCHISON & CUMMING LAW OFFICES OF

2136237400

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROBERTSON & ASSOCIATES LLP

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DALEY TODD A. ESQ

GLUCKSMAN RICHARD H. ESQ.

GOLAN ANNA ESQ.

ENRIGHT MADELYN ALBERTA

MORROW WILLIAM DEAN

EUM DAVID INN ESQ.

GLUCKSMAN RICHARD HARLAN ESQ.

HENSTRIDGE ROBERT MICHAEL

WALKER JOHN JOSEPH

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

EUM DAVID INN ESQ.

GLUCKSMAN RICHARD HARLAN ESQ.

MILANI ANTHONY RONALD

HENSTRIDGE ROBERT MICHAEL

KITCHEN CYNTHIA ANN

BOGGS JOSIAH C. IV

MALLON ANDREW JAMES

CHILDS MARY

REID STEWART DENNIS

PARKS SCOTT GREGORY

CLINTON DAVID A. ESQ.

WALKER JOHN JOSEPH

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER E. ESQ.

NADELSON ELIZABETH P

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO CONTEST T.J.M.'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO CONTEST T.J.M.'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Case Management Statement

9/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

10/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

10/7/2019: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Status Report

10/15/2019: Status Report

Notice of Settlement

10/15/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING TRIAL)

10/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING TRIAL)

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING TJM GLAZING, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

10/21/2019: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING TJM GLAZING, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

10/21/2019: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Ruling

10/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - NOTICE OF MOTION

10/29/2019: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) - NOTICE OF MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER WILLIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR GFS

10/29/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER WILLIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR GFS

Proof of Service by Mail

10/29/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/29/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Settlement

11/19/2019: Notice of Settlement

Application - APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT

12/11/2019: Application - APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND FIRM ADDRESS

12/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND FIRM ADDRESS

294 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by South Bay Storage, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to Settled Parties) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to Settled Parties) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Concrete Connection Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
528 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by South Bay Storage, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANT RICHMOND PLASTERING, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR CONSTRUCTION DEFECTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by South Bay Storage, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T.J.M. GLAZING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LYONS & CO. USA INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where RICHMOND PLASTERING INC. A CA CORP. is a litigant