This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2016 at 16:02:40 (UTC).

SORAYA, LLC VS BEACH BUMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2009 SORAYA, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BEACH BUMS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ALLEN, WILLIAM A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5137

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN, WILLIAM A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SORAYA LLC.

Defendant

BEACH BUMS INC.

Not Classified By Court

FILE COPY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBINSON

Defendant Attorney

WEBER SCOTT R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2010
  • Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord (Possession Only 15717 E. Imperial Hwy La Mirada, CA 90638 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • Judgment Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (ON: ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES AT THE TIME OF FILIING OF THE ACTION. only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • Default Entered (AS TO: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION only CRT JG SUBM. TO SE-F ON 04-15-10 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • Request for Trial Setting Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SORAYA LLC is a litigant