Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:27:31 (UTC).

SOPHEAK LOR VS. NAY HUY

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 SOPHEAK LOR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NAY HUY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0465

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOR SOPHEAK

Respondent

HUY NAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TAN VITTHARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2017
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- Filed and Entered on 2017-02-15 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2017-02-15 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Declaration (petnr prelim - Filed and Entered on 2017-02-15 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 01-12-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lor, Sopheak ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Judgment (term date 4-14-17 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lor, Sopheak - Signed on 2017-02-15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lor, Sopheak ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 11-10-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lor, Sopheak ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lor, Sopheak ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less