This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 08:47:38 (UTC).

SONIA VALENCIA VS DOLLAR TREE STORES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2016 SONIA VALENCIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5696

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VALENCIA SONIA

SANCHEZ SONIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

FOX RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHIRAZI LAW FIRM

SHIRAZI EMANUEL S. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MESSIHA DOMINIC J. ESQ.

PORTER LINDBERGH JR. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF SONIA VALENCIA'S COMPLAINT

5/9/2016: DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF SONIA VALENCIA'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/15/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/21/2016: DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/4/2016: Unknown

DECLARATION OF EMANUEL SHIRAZI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY THE COMPLAINT

8/18/2016: DECLARATION OF EMANUEL SHIRAZI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY THE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RULING ON THEIR MOTION TO STAY AND RULINGS AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/1/2016: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RULING ON THEIR MOTION TO STAY AND RULINGS AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF SONIA VALENCIA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS SEEKING PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS FROM PRIOR EMPLOYERS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR ALLOWI

11/21/2016: PLAINTIFF SONIA VALENCIA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS SEEKING PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS FROM PRIOR EMPLOYERS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR ALLOWI

ORDER RE: PLA1NTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS SEEKING PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS FROM PRIOR EMPLOYERS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/20/2016: ORDER RE: PLA1NTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS SEEKING PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS FROM PRIOR EMPLOYERS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

DECLARATION OF ALEX SANTANA IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. TO FURTHER RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FO

1/20/2017: DECLARATION OF ALEX SANTANA IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. TO FURTHER RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FO

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. TO FURTHER RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET O

1/20/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. TO FURTHER RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET O

Minute Order

2/7/2017: Minute Order

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

3/29/2017: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Proof of Service

4/11/2017: Proof of Service

Minute Order

4/18/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF SONIA VALENCIA

5/11/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF SONIA VALENCIA

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

6/22/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT

9/6/2017: JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • at 08:29 am in Department 53, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; Motion - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order (ON LAW AND MOTION RULING; ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Motion (JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 53, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Declaration (OF JOSEPH D. HADACEK ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • at 08:29 am in Department 53, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment (, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARYADJUDICATION*NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 6/20*) - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service (ON NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Answer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Amended Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Court Attendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (CCP 170.6 RE Malcolm H. Mackey, reassigned to Dept. 53 Steven J. Kleifield ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less