Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 00:54:05 (UTC).

SONIA RUBIO VS WAYNE PROVISION COMPANY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 SONIA RUBIO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WAYNE PROVISION COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4564

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RUBIO SONIA

Defendants and Respondents

GREENBERG HARRY

WAYNE PROVISION COMPANY INC.

PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAU WENDY M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/21/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE

1/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS' FINANCIAL CONDITION

1/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS' FINANCIAL CONDITION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS' FINANCIAL CONDITION; ETC

1/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS' FINANCIAL CONDITION; ETC

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/18/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

1/24/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DALIA R. KHALILI RE: WHY CASE CANNOT BE DISMISSED AT THIS TIME AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS ACTION

4/17/2018: DECLARATION OF DALIA R. KHALILI RE: WHY CASE CANNOT BE DISMISSED AT THIS TIME AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS ACTION

DECLARATION OF DALIA R. KHALILI RE: WHY CASE CANNOT BE DISMISSED AT THIS TIME AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS ACTION

5/29/2018: DECLARATION OF DALIA R. KHALILI RE: WHY CASE CANNOT BE DISMISSED AT THIS TIME AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO DISMISS ACTION

Minute Order

5/31/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF BRITTANY R. GIBSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

7/26/2018: DECLARATION OF BRITTANY R. GIBSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal

10/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

1/3/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/9/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

3/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT W. HELLNER; DECLARATION OF WENDY M. LAU; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT W. HELLNER; DECLARATION OF WENDY M. LAU; [PROPOSED] ORDER

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION MOTION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT W. HELLNER

4/25/2017: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION MOTION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT W. HELLNER

Unknown

4/28/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/1/2017: Minute Order

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Sonia Rubio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; (OSC RE Dismissal; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2017
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 69; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-01-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Sonia Rubio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT-SEX DISCRIMINATION ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Sonia Rubio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WAYNE PROVISION CO. INC. DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAU WENDY M.