This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 00:03:23 (UTC).

SONIA HERRERA VS L.A. FRESH POULTRY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2016 SONIA HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against L A FRESH POULTRY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1563

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERRERA SONIA

Defendants and Respondents

ELHAWARY AMANI

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

L.A. FRESH POULTRY INC

ELHAWARY ABDEL SALAM

ELHAWARY AHMED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BAUMAN SHAUN J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

5/24/2018: PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

9/19/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

10/4/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/4/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

4/18/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/24/2019: Proof of Personal Service

CoverSheet

12/6/2016: CoverSheet

Other -

12/7/2016: Other -

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT L.A. FRESH POULTRY, INC. BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

4/27/2017: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT L.A. FRESH POULTRY, INC. BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Enter Default) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Sonia Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC641563    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SONIA HERRERA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

L.A. FRESH POULTRY, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC641563

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 2, 2020

Plaintiff, Sonia Herrera’s attorney of record, Shaun J. Bauman, moves to be relieved as counsel.  Counsel declares the attorney-client relationship has deteriorated such that further representation is not possible. 

Counsel declares the moving papers were served on Client at a confirmed address.  Counsel declares he confirmed the address through certified mail, return receipt.  Certified mail does not establish proof the address is confirmed unless there is a signed return receipt.  The Court will, therefore, require a copy of the signed return receipt at the time of the hearing.

If Counsel appears and satisfies the Court that Plaintiff’s address is confirmed, the motion will be granted.  

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  

Case Number: BC641563    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SONIA HERRERA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

L.A. FRESH POULTRY, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC641563

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 2, 2020

Plaintiff, Sonia Herrera’s attorney of record, Shaun J. Bauman, moves to be relieved as counsel.  Counsel declares the attorney-client relationship has deteriorated such that further representation is not possible. 

Counsel declares the moving papers were served on Client at a confirmed address.  Counsel declares he confirmed the address through certified mail, return receipt.  Certified mail does not establish proof the address is confirmed unless there is a signed return receipt.  The Court will, therefore, require a copy of the signed return receipt at the time of the hearing.

If Counsel appears and satisfies the Court that Plaintiff’s address is confirmed, the motion will be granted.  

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.