This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2023 at 06:54:52 (UTC).

SONIA CARRANCO VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 05/05/2016 SONIA CARRANCO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9660

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRANCO SONIA

Defendant

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JENNIFER A. CARVER

BENT SERGIO

Defendant Attorney

LOOMIS RICHARD HENRY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

1/18/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PLAINTIFF SONIA CARRANCO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY WITH NEW TRIAL DATE

3/6/2018: PLAINTIFF SONIA CARRANCO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY WITH NEW TRIAL DATE

Minute Order -

3/6/2018: Minute Order -

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ATTENDANT DATES; ETC

3/6/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ATTENDANT DATES; ETC

ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ATTENDANT DATES

3/6/2018: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ATTENDANT DATES

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF HALL R. MARSTON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

6/11/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF HALL R. MARSTON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

Minute Order -

6/11/2018: Minute Order -

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY BEYOND THE CURRENT DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT AN INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PL

6/11/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY BEYOND THE CURRENT DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO CONDUCT AN INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PL

NOTTCE OF RULING ON EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

6/12/2018: NOTTCE OF RULING ON EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

DECLARATION OF RICHARD LOOMIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DFFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO REOPEN DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CCP 2024.050

6/12/2018: DECLARATION OF RICHARD LOOMIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DFFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO REOPEN DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO CCP 2024.050

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO PERMIT DICOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/12/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO PERMIT DICOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Proof of Service Personal Service -

6/12/2018: Proof of Service Personal Service -

PLAINTIFF SONIA CARRANCOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY TO ALLOW IT TO CONDUCT AN UMTIMELY IME

6/19/2018: PLAINTIFF SONIA CARRANCOS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY TO ALLOW IT TO CONDUCT AN UMTIMELY IME

DECLARATION OF RICI LARD LOOMIS [N SUPPORT OF REPLY OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGLES TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

6/22/2018: DECLARATION OF RICI LARD LOOMIS [N SUPPORT OF REPLY OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGLES TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

6/22/2018: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE.

6/26/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

6/28/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES

6/29/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY PAST DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SONIA CARRANCO on 05/05/2016, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sonia Carranco as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Sonia Carranco (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNotice OSC re Dismissal Hearing; Filed by: Sonia Carranco (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Carranco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 05/31/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 4A - Hon. Christopher K. Luieffective 12/31/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 03/15/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement): Location changed from Department 4 to Department 4A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement of entire case: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketDocument:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketDocument:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Motion to Compel 10/02/17 at 1:30 pm Robert B. Broadbelt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketDocument:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketDocument:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 05/06/19 at 8:30 am Howard L. Halm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less