This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 14:12:18 (UTC).

SOMPO JAPAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPEC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2010 SOMPO JAPAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPEC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5969

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOMPO JAPAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendants

ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN INT'L SPECIALTY LINES INS. CO.

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

ASPEN INSURANCE UK LIMITED

COLONY NATIONAL INS. CO.

EVEREST NATIONAL INS. CO.

FIRST MERCURY INS. CO.

FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

GREAT AMERICAN E & S INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

ILLINOIS UNION INSURANCE COMPANY

LANDMARK AMERICAN INS. CO.

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION

LIBERTY SURPLUS LINE INSURANCE COMPANY

NAT'L UNION FIRE INS. CO. OF PITTS. PA

NORTH AMERICAN CAPACITY INS. CO.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEWTON REMMEL APC

Defendant Attorneys

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN & BENTLEY

CLINTON & CLINTON

PC CLAUSEN MILLER

WESTON & MCELVAIN LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT LLP

SINNOTT DITO MOURA & PUEBLA

SHEPPARD MULLIN ET AL. LLP

TRESSLER LLP

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

SMITH SMITH & FEELEY LLP

CRESSWELL ECHEGUREN RODGERS & NOBLE

HUANG VEATCH

BRANSON BRINKOP GRIFFITH & STRONG LLP

SELVIN WRAITH HALMAN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 311; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Lexington Insurance Company (Defendant); Admiral Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 311; Status Conference (Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 311; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Admiral Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
233 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUT4MONS AND COMPLATHIT (NORTH AMERICAN CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND EQUITABLE CONTRIBUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less