This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 06:29:55 (UTC).

SMART HOME ENERGY SOLUTIONS, INC. VS JOAN POWELL, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2016 SMART HOME ENERGY SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOAN POWELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6630

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

POWELL JOAN

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

D M J J CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA ADVANCED

HOME IMPROVEMENT INC. DBA CLEARVIEW

SMART HOMES ENERGY SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

USHER ULRIC E. J. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

OSAKI KERRY G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/15/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

6/15/2016: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

6/15/2016: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Unknown

6/20/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER

9/7/2016: ANSWER

Unknown

9/7/2016: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JOAN POWELL

9/7/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JOAN POWELL

NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

9/13/2016: NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR 16A08765

9/13/2016: REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR 16A08765

RECEIPT FOR REGISTER OF ACTIONS

9/13/2016: RECEIPT FOR REGISTER OF ACTIONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/13/2016: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/28/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

10/18/2016: Unknown

Proof of Service

10/20/2016: Proof of Service

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

10/25/2016: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

Unknown

11/1/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

11/2/2016: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department ATV06, BRIAN C. YEP, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (2) OSC RE: STIPULATION TO PRIVATE MEDIATION) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CMC; NOTICE OF OSC RE STIP TO PRIVATE MEDIATION ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department ATV14, BRIAN C. YEP, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Continued by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint (SMART HOME ENERGY SOLUTIONS, INC. ); Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Proof of Service (RE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Answer (JOAN POWELL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Summons Filed (ON CROSS COMPLAINT ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (JOAN POWELL VS SMART HOME ENERGY SOLUTIONS, INC., ET AL ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (JANE POWELL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P S HOME IMPROVEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DMJJ Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSAKI, KERRY G.