This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2020 at 15:37:00 (UTC).

SIMON DAVIES, ET AL VS. GETFUGU INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2010 SIMON DAVIES filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against GETFUGU INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID L. MINNING, CAROLYN B. KUHL and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6462

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID L. MINNING

CAROLYN B. KUHL

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIES SIMON

WARNOCK DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

ASIATIC COMMERCE BANK

BAILEY ALAN J.

BEGBIES TRAYNOR GROUP

CARRENDER MICHAEL

CARROLL STEVE

CHAMPION MARK

CORPORATE VALUATION ADVISORS INC.

DAVID RUBIN & PARTNERS

DOE 1 THROUGH DOE 100

DRAGON PHOENIX (CHINA) LTD.

ERIKSON STEFAN

FREER ANNELI

FREER CARL

FREER ERICKA

GETFUGU INC.

IRWIN JASON

JENKINS RICHARD

JUANITA GROUP LTD

55 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUMMINS & WHITE LLP

BILLHEIMER SUSAN E.

RICHARD J. OPARIL(ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

IMAN REZA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DANAHER CHARLES A. ESQ.

JOEL T. SHACKELFORD

ZHODANIA THEONA

O'MEARA FRANCES ESQ.

KIRKLAND JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

3/16/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

DECLARATION OF RICHARD J. OPARIL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MICHAEL JAY SOLOMON AND DONALD A. KURZS NOTICE OF MOTION ANI) `1OIION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL P

5/9/2011: DECLARATION OF RICHARD J. OPARIL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MICHAEL JAY SOLOMON AND DONALD A. KURZS NOTICE OF MOTION ANI) `1OIION FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL P

ORDE GRANTING EXPARTE APPLICATION SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATES FOR DEFENDANT CORPORATE VALUATION ADVISORS, INC.'S (1) DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPAINT AND (2) CIV.PROC. CODE 1030 MOTI

6/23/2011: ORDE GRANTING EXPARTE APPLICATION SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATES FOR DEFENDANT CORPORATE VALUATION ADVISORS, INC.'S (1) DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPAINT AND (2) CIV.PROC. CODE 1030 MOTI

DECLARATION OF RICHARD J. OPAR1L IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE VALUATION ADVISORS, INC.S MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR ATFORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1030

8/15/2011: DECLARATION OF RICHARD J. OPAR1L IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE VALUATION ADVISORS, INC.S MOTION FOR SECURITY FOR ATFORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1030

STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/10/2011: STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

12/8/2011: Minute Order -

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

12/27/2011: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

DECLARATION OF THEONA ZHORDANIA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD JENKINS, STEVE CARROLL, CHRISTINE PETERS, ALAN BAILEY, I)EREK NORTON, VRAJESH CHOKSHI, MARK LAPRESLE, LEATHEM STEARN, BERNARD STOLIAR,

2/16/2012: DECLARATION OF THEONA ZHORDANIA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD JENKINS, STEVE CARROLL, CHRISTINE PETERS, ALAN BAILEY, I)EREK NORTON, VRAJESH CHOKSHI, MARK LAPRESLE, LEATHEM STEARN, BERNARD STOLIAR,

CUMMINS & WHITE LLP AND PATTON BOGGS LLP?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ETC

2/22/2012: CUMMINS & WHITE LLP AND PATTON BOGGS LLP?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ETC

DEFENDANT DEREK NORTON?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO: (1) SET ASIDE DEFAULT, ETC

3/5/2012: DEFENDANT DEREK NORTON?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO: (1) SET ASIDE DEFAULT, ETC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATIORNEY?CIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

3/6/2012: SUBSTITUTION OF ATIORNEY?CIVIL (WITHOUT COURT ORDER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (OF THEONA ZHORDANIA IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S FEBRUARY 24, 2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 49, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Motion (FOR SECURITY) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT; ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE RULING RE MOTION TO (1) SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND (2) QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketNotice (OF FIRM NAME CHANGE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DocketNotice of Motion (AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved as Counsel (FILED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketApplication-Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (BC444530 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less