This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:38:59 (UTC).

SIMI R CRUZ VS RAYMOND CRUZ

Case Summary

On 07/08/2016 SIMI R CRUZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAYMOND CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOXER, DOREEN B., GIZA, ALEXANDER C.D., TAMZARIAN, ARMEN, HANSELL, DEAN and HALL, TAMARA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3008

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BOXER, DOREEN B.

GIZA, ALEXANDER C.D.

TAMZARIAN, ARMEN

HANSELL, DEAN

HALL, TAMARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRUZ SIMI R.

Respondent

CRUZ RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HOWARD KRISTEN M.

HOWARD KRISTEN M

Respondent Attorney

WIESNER SUSAN ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • Hearingat 8:30 AM in Department 7 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (426-reviewed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 7, Giza, Alexander C.D., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 7, Giza, Alexander C.D., Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 7, Giza, Alexander C.D., Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice - Peremptory Challenge ((170.6) to Judge Tamzarian - On Behalf of: Respondent: Cruz, Raymond ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Personal - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Simi ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketMilestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 07-21-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Simi ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kristen M. Howard - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Simi ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Simi ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Family Law (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Simi - Hearing Set on 2016-09-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Simi ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIESNER SUSAN ELIZABETH