This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 03:50:38 (UTC).

SILVA HOVHANNISYAN VS AEROPOSTALE INC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 SILVA HOVHANNISYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AEROPOSTALE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4180

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HOVHANNISYAN SILVA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

AEROPOSTALE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ARMEN M. TASHJIAN

TASHJIAN ARMEN MICHAEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/18/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

7/31/2018: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Minute Order

9/4/2018: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

9/4/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Minute Order

3/4/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/4/2019: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/16/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

12/16/2016: SUMMONS

Unknown

12/16/2016: Unknown

Unknown

5/23/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)) of 03/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (Motion to Set Aside Dismissal; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Motion; Filed by Silva Hovhannisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Silva Hovhannisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Silva Hovhannisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC644180    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SILVA HOVHANNISYAN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

AEROPOSTALE, INC., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC644180

[TENTATIVE] ORDER

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 13, 2020

Plaintiff, Silva Hovhannisyan filed this action against Defendant, Aeropostale, Inc. on 12/16/16 for damages arising out of an incident that occurred in one of Defendant’s stores; while she was shopping, a piece of metal from a clothing rack became dislodged and struck her in the face, causing her to sustain injuries.

Plaintiff has not, to date, filed proof of service of the summons and complaint. The case was called for an FSC on 6/01/18 and trial on 6/18/18; Plaintiff appeared for neither, and on 6/18/18 the Court dismissed the case. On 9/04/18, upon Plaintiff’s motion, the Court vacated the dismissal. Plaintiff moved for relief on the ground that Defendant had filed bankruptcy, and Plaintiff believed the case was stayed and therefore did not take steps to prosecute the action.

In its 9/04/18 order, the Court concluded, “The Court sets an OSC re: status of the bankruptcy for Monday, 3/04/19 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.” Plaintiff did not appear on 3/04/19, and the Court scheduled an OSC re: dismissal for 6/13/19; the Court also ordered Plaintiff’s attorney to file a brief concerning the status of the bankruptcy at least five days prior to the 6/13/19 OSC. Plaintiff did not appear on 6/13/19, and the Court dismissed the case.

On 12/12/19, the day before the six-month mandatory dismissal statute was set to run, Plaintiff filed this motion for relief from the dismissal. Plaintiff’s attorney declares he has taken no steps to prosecute the case because Defendant’s bankruptcy remains pending. Plaintiff’s attorney’s declaration is entirely silent concerning his failure to appear on 3/04/19, silent concerning the obligation to file a brief prior to the 6/13/19 hearing date, and silent concerning the failure to attend the 6/13/19 hearing.

The Court wishes to hear from Counsel personally concerning the status of the bankruptcy and Counsel’s plans for prosecuting the action. The Court will grant the motion if and only if Counsel appears and explains the status of the case to the satisfaction of the Court.

Dated this 13th day of January, 2020

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court